EP2122271 - INTEGRATED MULTIPLE POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 1 Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06434 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOVIO, Stefano 17 rue Paul Verlaine 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
STUMPF, Andre 15 rue des Belges 76240 Bonsecours / FR | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
BOVIO, Stefano 361 crs Zola F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | ||
02 /
STUMPF, Andre 15 rue des Belges F-76240 Bonsecours / FR | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Taylor, Adam David Frank B. Dehn & Co. St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07749693.3 | 31.01.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007US02739 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008094148 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122271 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B27/00, F25B49/00, F25D29/00, B60H1/00, B60H1/32 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
F25B27/00 (EP,US);
B60H1/00428 (EP,US);
B60H1/3222 (EP,US);
F25D29/003 (EP,US);
B60L2250/16 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0253 (EP,US);
Y02T10/88 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | F25B1/00, F25B27/00, F25B49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES MEHRFACHENERGIEUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEM ZUM TRANSPORT VON KÜHLEINHEITEN | [2009/48] | English: | INTEGRATED MULTIPLE POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION UNITS | [2009/48] | French: | SYSTÈME INTÉGRÉ MULTIPLE DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE POUR DES UNITÉS DE TRANSPORT À RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 13.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/14] | Appeal following examination | 22.02.2017 | Appeal received No. T1850/17 | 18.04.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.03.2021 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2021/10] | 13.05.2021 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2021/20] | 14.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003106332 (OKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0029] - [0068]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006015429 (KOOL IDEAS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract * | International search | [X]US4738118 (KANAZAWA HIDETOSHI [JP]); | [X]US4968338 (SUGIYAMA AKIYOSHI [JP]); | [X]US5439868 (ONITSUKA SHIGENORI [JP], et al); | [X]US5499508 (ARAI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2003106332 |