EP1994719 - INTELLIGENT MEDIA GATEWAY SELECTION FOR MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATION SESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITRA, Debasis 133 Summit Avenue, Apartment 43 Summit, NJ 07901 / US | 02 /
SANIEE, Iraj 27 Colonial Way New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | 03 /
WALID, Anwar I. 30 Valley Drive Watchung, NJ 07069 / US | 04 /
WIDJAJA, Indra 63 Dixon Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Cockayne, Gillian, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park, Electric Avenue, Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Cockayne, Gillian, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Cockayne, Gillian, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07750297.9 | 08.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US03449 | Priority number, date | US20060351367 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 351367 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007095078 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994719 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994719 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
H04L65/103 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1101 (KR,US);
H04L12/66 (KR);
H04L45/00 (EP);
H04L47/122 (KR);
H04L65/104 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE MEDIAGATEWAY-AUSWAHL FÜR MULTIMEDIA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSITZUNGEN | [2008/48] | English: | INTELLIGENT MEDIA GATEWAY SELECTION FOR MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATION SESSIONS | [2008/48] | French: | SÉLECTION DE PASSERELLE MÉDIA INTELLIGENTE POUR SESSIONS DE COMMUNICATION MULTIMÉDIA | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 09.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2009 | BE | 19.08.2009 | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IT | 19.08.2009 | LT | 19.08.2009 | LV | 19.08.2009 | NL | 19.08.2009 | PL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | IS | 19.12.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | IE | 08.02.2010 | LU | 08.02.2010 | HU | 20.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
LU | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004114570 (VIKBERG JARI TAPIO [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0170] *; | [X]WO2004102919 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 20 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 14 * * page 9, line 8 - page 11, line 15 *; | [A]US2005135340 (LEE HYUN J [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039] * |