EP1991655 - MICROREACTOR WITH AUXILIARY FLUID MOTION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioprocessors Corporation 12-A Cabot Road Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Timothy, J. 124 Main Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
AUMOND, Bernardo 19 Bassett St. 2 Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07750890.1 | 15.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US04088 | Priority number, date | US20060774409P | 17.02.2006 Original published format: US 774409 P | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007098027 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991655 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/02, C12M1/09, C12M1/06, C12M1/10 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
B01F31/23 (EP,US);
B01F31/65 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
C12M23/16 (US);
C12M27/00 (EP);
C12M29/06 (EP);
C12M29/10 (US);
C12M29/12 (EP);
C12M29/18 (EP);
C12M33/14 (EP);
C12M35/04 (US);
C12M41/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROREAKTOR MIT STRÖMUNGSHILFSSTEUERUNG | [2008/47] | English: | MICROREACTOR WITH AUXILIARY FLUID MOTION CONTROL | [2008/47] | French: | MICROREACTEUR AVEC COMMANDE AUXILIAIRE DU MOUVEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 06.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0143871 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US]); | [A]US2003175947 (LIU ROBIN HUI [US], et al); | [A]WO2004009226 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [AD]US2004121454 (JURY ANDREY ZARUR [US], et al); | [AD]US2005032204 (RODGERS SETH T [US], et al); | [X]WO2005121310 (BIOPROCESSORS CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2005287673 (JOHHSON TIMOTHY J [US], et al) |