EP2215450 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ANALYTE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexus DX, Inc. 6759 Mesa Ridge Road Suite 100 San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Nanogen Inc. 10398 Pacific Center Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOKER, David, Dickson 4895 Glenhollow Circle Oceanside, CA 92057 / US | 02 /
LIDGARD, Graham, Peter 1432 Torrey Pines Rd La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
EGAN, Richard, Laswell 3949 Stanford Drive Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Christopher, Johann 3735 Mount Blackburn Avenue San Diego, CA 92111 / US | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/32] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07751240.8 | 21.02.2007 | [2010/32] | WO2007US04466 | Priority number, date | US20060775649P | 21.02.2006 Original published format: US 775649 P | US20060789345P | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 789345 P | US20060866932P | 22.11.2006 Original published format: US 866932 P | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007098184 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2215450 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215450 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558, G01N33/53, G01N33/58, G01N33/543, C12Q1/70, B01L3/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (US);
B01L3/5029 (EP,US);
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/558 (EP);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (EP,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0683 (EP,US);
G01N2333/11 (US);
G01N2469/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | G01N33/543, G01N33/58, G01N33/53, G01N33/00, G01N15/06, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/68, C07H21/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/32] | G01N15/06, G01N33/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/68, C07H21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM ANALYTNACHWEIS | [2010/32] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ANALYTE DETECTION | [2010/32] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR DÉTECTION D'ANALYTES | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 09.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 13.03.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 25.06.2010 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 09.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2009 | 28.02.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2010 | 28.02.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | LU | 21.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.02.2007 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0299428 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * pages 5,6 * * pages 8-14; figures 1-6 * * pages 18-19; examples 3-8; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP0427534 (CHEMTRAK INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * pages 2-4,7; figures 1-7; claims 8-10 * * pages 8-10 *; | [Y]WO9634287 (QUIDEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * claims 1-20 *; | [Y]US5602040 (MAY KEITH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, line 35 - column 7, line 56; figures 1-14; claims 1-34 * * the whole document * * column 8, line 31 - column 15, line 22 *; | [Y]WO0017626 (SYNTRON BIORES INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 30; figures 1-15; claims 1-12 * * pages 8-15 * * pages 17,20 *; | [Y]WO0077524 (PRAXSYS BIOSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document ** figures 1-10; claims 1-47 *; | [Y]US2002155028 (WONG RAPHAEL C [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0009] - [0022] - [0 38] - [0044] - [0 63] , [0064]; figures 1-11; claims 1-34 *; | [Y]WO03025573 (PHARMACIA DIAGNOSTICS AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-19 * pages 4,5; figures 1-3; claims 1-13 *; | [Y]EP1473565 (CHARM SCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0002] - [0024]; figures 1-18; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]WO2005045408 (AMERICAN BIO MEDICA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * figures 1-13; claims 1-25 *; | [Y]WO2005057216 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * claims 1-20 * | International search | [X]US4366225 (KOSINSKI JAMES J); | [Y]US2004197793 (HASSIBI ARJANG [US], et al); | [Y]US2004197845 (HASSIBI ARJANG [US], et al); | [T]US2007161078 (LU PETER S [US], et al) | Examination | US2006019406 | - GEERTRUIDA A POSTHUMA-TRUMPIE ET AL, "Lateral flow (immuno)assay: its strengths, weaknesses, opportunities and threats. A literature survey", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20080813), vol. 393, no. 2, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 569 - 582, XP019652854 |