EP1996505 - PUNCTURABLE CAP AND PIERCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DS Smith Plastics Limited Beech House Whitebrook Park 68 Lower Cookham Road Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 8XY / GB | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states DS Smith Plastics Limited 4-16 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Mark, A. 12763 Shelly Lane Plainfield, IL 60544 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07751901.5 | 28.02.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US05170 | Priority number, date | US20060365097 | 01.03.2006 Original published format: US 365097 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007100854 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996505 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996505 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B67D99/00, B65D47/36, B65D51/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B65D77/067 (EP,US);
B65D51/226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | B67D5/00, B65D47/36, B65D51/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/49] | B67D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHSTOSSBARE KAPPE UND LOCHWERKZEUG | [2008/49] | English: | PUNCTURABLE CAP AND PIERCER | [2008/49] | French: | BOUCHON PERCABLE ET POINÇON | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 27.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2007 | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | ES | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4574985 (SYKES DONALD J [US]); | [A]US5111970 (RUTTER CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al); | [Y]US5141134 (MACHADO LEONEL H [CA]); | [A]US6378730 (REDDY BALAKRISHNA [US], et al); | [X]JP2004065543 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]US6705462 (KASUYA SHOJI [JP]); | [Y]US6971548 (SMITH MARK A [US]) |