EP1989632 - MODEL- BASED DEWARPING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPULINK MANAGEMENT CENTER, INC. 3545 Long Beach Boulevard 110 Long Beach CA 90807 / US | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Minghui Room 1328, Building Li Ke No. 1, Department Of Computer Science And Technology, Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | 02 /
LI, Rongfeng Room 1328, Building Li Ke No.1, Department Of Computer Science And Technology, Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | 03 /
LI, Wenxin Room 1329, Building Li Ke No.1, Department Of Computer Science And Technology Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | 04 /
HEANEY, Edward, P., Jr. 1838 East 2nd Street Apt. 4 Long Beach, CA 90802 / US | 05 /
CHAN, Karl 16262 Santa Barbara Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | 06 /
RAPELJE, Kurt, A. 3738 West 144th Street Hawthorn, CA 90250 / US | 07 /
FU, Bin Room 1328, Building Li Ke No.1 Department of Computer Science and Technology Peking University Beijing, 100871 / CN | 08 /
FENG, Bin 1012 176th Avenur, N.E. Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/46] | 01 /
WU, Minghui Room 1328, Building Li Ke No. 1, Department Of Computer Science And Technology, Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Rongfeng Room 1328, Building Li Ke No.1, Department Of Computer Science And Technology, Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Wenxin Room 1329, Building Li Ke No.1, Department Of Computer Science And Technology Peking University Beijing 100871 / CN | |||
04 /
HEANEY, Edward, P., Jr. 1838 East 2nd Street Apt. 4 Long Beach, CA 90802 / US | |||
05 /
CHAN, Karl 16262 Santa Barbara Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | |||
06 /
RAPELJE, Kurt, A. 3738 West 144th Street Hawthorn, CA 90250 / US | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07752208.4 | 02.03.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007US05492 | Priority number, date | US20060368260 | 02.03.2006 Original published format: US 368260 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007103251 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1989632 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, H04N1/387, G06K9/20, G06T5/00 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
G06T5/80 (EP,US);
G06V10/30 (KR);
G06T3/06 (EP,US);
G06T5/00 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06V30/1444 (EP,US);
G06V30/1478 (EP,US);
G06V30/414 (US);
H04N1/028 (KR);
H04N1/387 (US);
G06T2207/30176 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/46] | G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | MODELLBASIERTES ENTZERRUNGSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT | [2008/46] | English: | MODEL- BASED DEWARPING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2008/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SUPPRESSION DE DEFORMATIONS BASES SUR UN MODELE | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 09.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/41] | 05.08.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/41] | Appeal following examination | 05.06.2020 | Appeal received No. T1711/20 | 05.08.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHRISTOPH H. LAMPERT AND TIM BRAUN AND ADRIAN ULGES AND DANIEL KEYSERS AND THOMAS M. BREUEL, "Oblivious document capture and real-time retrieval", INT'L. WORKSHOP ON CAMERA-BASED DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, (20050101), XP055071002 [X] 1-13 * sections "Feature validation","Preprocessing", "Image flattening";; figures 3, 6 * | [A] - ULGES A ET AL, "Document Image Dewarping using Robust Estimation of Curled Text Lines", EIGHTS INTERNATIONAL PROCEEDINGS ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, IEEE, (20050831), doi:10.1109/ICDAR.2005.90, ISBN 978-0-7695-2420-7, pages 1001 - 1005, XP010878166 [A] 1-13 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.2005.90 | [IP] - SHIJIAN LU ET AL, "Document Flattening through Grid Modeling and Regularization", 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2006. ICPR 2006., (20060820), ISBN 0-7695-2521-0, pages 971 - 974, XP055166975 [IP] 1-13 * abstract * * section 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2006.458 | [A] - WU C ET AL, "Document Image De-warping for Text/Graphics Recognition", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE/COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE > (EUROCRYPT )CHES 2008 (LNCS), SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (20020101), vol. 2396, doi:10.1007/3-540-70659-3_36, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, pages 348 - 357, XP007901727 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-70659-3_36 | [A] - JIAN LIANG ET AL, "Camera-based analysis of text and documents: a survey", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION (IJDAR), SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050701), vol. 7, no. 2-3, doi:10.1007/S10032-004-0138-Z, ISSN 1433-2825, pages 84 - 104, XP019352711 [A] 1-13 * sections 2.4 and 4.2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10032-004-0138-z | International search | [Y]US5097517 (HOLT ARTHUR W [US]); | [X]US2003128875 (PILU MAURIZIO [GB], et al); | [X]US2005122399 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al); | [A] - DOERMANN D. ET AL., "Progres in camera-based document image analysis", ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (20030803), URL: http://www.cse.salford.ac.uk/prima/CDAR2003/Papers/0111_keynote_III_doermann_d.pdf, XP008131055 |