EP2002547 - METHOD FOR ENCODED OR ENCRYPTED BIT STREAM SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 W. Nasa Boulevard MS A-11l Melbourne FL 32919 / US | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAVER, Joseph 19 Morven Road Rochester, New York 14610 / US | 02 /
VOGLEWEDE, Paul 15 West Ham Circle N. Chili, New York 14514 / US | 03 /
LEIBY, Edwin, Mccall 2461 Garden Street Avon, NY 14414 / US | 04 /
CHAMBERLAIN, Mark, Walter 740 HF Five Points Road Honeoye Falls, NY 14472 / US | 05 /
PEACH, Eric 1 High Meadow Drive Penfield, New York 14526 / US | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07752302.5 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007US05588 | Priority number, date | US20060377492 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: US 377492 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007108924 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002547 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002547 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/7073, H04L7/04, H04B1/7156 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
H04B1/7156 (EP,US);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04L7/042 (EP,US);
H04B2001/71563 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | H03M7/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/18] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR KODIERTE ODER VERSCHLÜSSELTE BITREIHENSYNCHRONISIERUNG | [2008/51] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCODED OR ENCRYPTED BIT STREAM SYNCHRONIZATION | [2008/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION DE FLUX BINAIRE CODÉ OU CHIFFRÉ | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 17.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4361896 (GARNER TERRY N) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 17 * * claims 27-29 * * claim 43 * * claims 50-52 * * claims 61-67 * [I] 5-8; | [A]US4527275 (RUSSELL JAMES L [US]) [A] 1-8* column 9, line 18 - column 11, line 59 * | International search | [X]US4527275 (RUSSELL JAMES L [US]); | [Y]US4729123 (WHEEN ANDREW J T [GB]); | [A]US6298165 (HOWARD PAUL GLOR [US]); | [Y]US2006053359 (CHAE SU-CHANG [KR], et al) | by applicant | US4361896 | US4527275 |