EP1996681 - LIQUID OIL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING POLYMERIC VISCOSITY INDEX IMPROVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/49] | VISCOSITY INDEX IMPROVER FOR LUBRICATING OILS | ||
[2013/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraton Polymers U.S. LLC 3333 Highway 6 South, Room CA-103 Houston TX 77082 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. CLAIR, David, John 13831 Queensbury Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2013/46] |
Former [2008/49] | Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A. Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. Postbus 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 07752429.6 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US05728 | Priority number, date | US20060781452P | 10.03.2006 Original published format: US 781452 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007106346 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996681 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996681 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/16, C10M143/12, C10M171/04, C10M177/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
C10L1/1658 (EP,US);
C10M119/00 (KR);
C10M143/12 (EP,US);
C10M169/02 (KR);
C10M171/04 (EP,US);
C10M177/00 (EP,US);
C10L1/165 (EP,US);
C10M2205/04 (EP,US);
C10M2205/06 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (KR);
C10N2060/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2205/04, C10M2205/06, C10N2060/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | C10M143/12, C10M171/04, C10M177/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/49] | C10L1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/16] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EINEN POLYMEREN VISKOSITÄTSINDEX-VERBESSERER | [2013/36] | English: | LIQUID OIL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING POLYMERIC VISCOSITY INDEX IMPROVER | [2013/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'HUILE COMPRENANT UN ADDITIF DE VISCOSITÉ POLYMÈRE | [2013/36] |
Former [2008/49] | VISKOSITÄTS-INDEXVERBESSERER FÜR SCHMIERÖLE | ||
Former [2008/49] | VISCOSITY INDEX IMPROVER FOR LUBRICATING OILS | ||
Former [2008/49] | AMÉLIORATEUR DE L'INDICE DE VISCOSITÉ POUR DES HUILES LUBRIFIANTES | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 13.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.07.2013 | 24.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3775329 (ECKERT R) [Y] 1-8* abstract *; | [Y]US3965019 (ST CLAIR DAVID J, et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 10 - line 40 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO03066696 (KRATON POLYMERS RES BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-6,21 * * page 1, line 1 - line 8 * | International search | [Y]US3700633 (WALD MILTON M, et al); | [A]US4141847 (KIOVSKY THOMAS E); | [A]US5460739 (RHODES ROBERT B [US], et al); | [Y]US6232279 (STEIGERWALD EDGAR ANDREAS [DE]); | [Y]US2005137350 (BENING ROBERT C [US], et al) | by applicant | US3494942 | USRE27145E | US3634594 | US3670054 | US3700633 | US3772196 | US3835083 | US4039593 | US4116917 | US4578429 | US4882384 | US4898914 | US4970265 | US5206300 | US5276101 | US5458791 | US5460739 | US5506299 | US5516831 | US6034042 | US6492469 | US7169848 |