EP2013601 - REDUNDANT MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC REMOTE SEAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2021 [2021/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount, Inc. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDTKE, Robert c/o Rosemount Inc. 12001 Technologie Drive Eden Paririe, MN 55344 / US | [2020/10] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
HEDTKE, Robert c/o Rosemount Inc. 12001 Technologie Drive Eden Paririe, MN 55344 / US | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [2020/10] |
Former [2009/39] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne, Tyne and Wear NE1 4XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07752837.0 | 12.03.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US06166 | Priority number, date | US20060387550 | 23.03.2006 Original published format: US 387550 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007111827 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013601 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013601 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/06, G01L19/00, G01L7/08 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G01L15/00 (EP,US);
G01L19/0007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | G01L7/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2020/10] |
Former [2009/12] | CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REDUNDANTES MECHANISCHES UND ELEKTRONISCHES DRUCKMITTLERSYSTEM | [2009/03] | English: | REDUNDANT MECHANICAL AND ELECTRONIC REMOTE SEAL SYSTEM | [2009/03] | French: | SYSTEME REDONDANT MECANIQUE ET ELECTRONIQUE DE GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE DISTANTE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2010 | 31.03.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19949831 (WIKA ALEXANDER WIEGAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,15,16 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 12 *[I] 6,8-11 | International search | [A]US6038961 (FILIPPI GIOVANNI [US], et al); | [A]US2005225035 (SUNDET PAUL C [US]); | [X]US2005284227 (BRODEN DAVID A [US], et al); | [AP]US7036381 (BRODEN DAVID A [US], et al); | [AP]US2006162459 (BRODEN DAVID A [US]); | [AO]US2006162458 (BRODEN DAVID A [US]) |