EP1996989 - TEMPERATURE-CONTROLLED ENCLOSURES AND TEMPERATURE CONTROL SYSTEM USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Temptronic Corporation 41 Hampden Road Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2018/26] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Temptronic Corporation 4 Commercial Street Sharon, MA 02067-1653 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Kenneth, M. 424 Winter Street Holliston, MA 01746-1127 / US | 02 /
CONROY, Michael, F. 108 Augsburg Drive Attleboro, MA 02703-2410 / US | 03 /
LOWERRE, Edward 9949 Shore Road, 502 Brooklyn, NY 11209-7905 / US | 04 /
PELRIN, James 95 Guernsey Avenue Taunton, MA 02780-7234 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/49] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07753004.6 | 13.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US06344 | Priority number, date | US20060784044P | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 784044 P | US20060784745P | 22.03.2006 Original published format: US 784745 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007109027 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996989 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996989 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01L1/00, F25D23/06, G01M99/00, B01L7/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
B01L1/00 (EP,US);
F25D23/061 (US);
G01M99/002 (EP,US);
B01L2200/147 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1838 (EP,US);
B01L7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | G05D23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURGESTEUERTE GEHÄUSE UND SYSTEM ZUR TEMPERATURSTEUERUNG DAMIT | [2008/49] | English: | TEMPERATURE-CONTROLLED ENCLOSURES AND TEMPERATURE CONTROL SYSTEM USING THE SAME | [2008/49] | French: | CONTENANTS À TEMPÉRATURE RÉGULÉE ET SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE LES UTILISANT | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2007 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | GB | 13.03.2018 | IE | 13.03.2018 | LU | 13.03.2018 | MT | 13.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.03.2007 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.03.2007 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5205969 (NETT JR JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-79 * column 2, line 24 - column 23, line 7; claim 1 *; | [X]US5271230 (SPIESS LEWIS H [GB]) [X] 1-79 * column 1, line 9 - column 23, line 20; figures 1-8; claims 1-38 *; | [X]US6098473 (HAFNER ERICH [US]) [X] 1-79 * column 1, line 12 - column 9, line 51 *; | [X]US6189484 (YIN GERALD ZHEYAO [US], et al) [X] 1-79 * column 3, line 38 - column 13, line 67; figures 1-9; claims 1-44 *; | [X]US6315209 (TRIPP DALE S [US]) [X] 1-79 * column 1, line 17 - column 4, line 33; figures 1-3; claims 1-18 *; | [X]WO03012567 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-79 * paragraphs [0002] - [0026]; claims 1-31 *; | [A]US2004151629 (PEASE GRANT [US], et al) [A] 1-79* paragraphs [0002] - [0156]; claims 1,36-38 *; | [X]US6908512 (IVANOV IGOR C [US], et al) [X] 1-79 * paragraphs [0015] - [0079]; figures 1-5 * |