EP1999349 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SPLIT-CYCLE ENGINE WASTE HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scuderi Group, LLC 1111 Elm Street Suite 4 West Springfield MA 01089 / US | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORNER, Charles K. 1621 Corporation Street Beaver, PA 15009 / US | 02 /
SCUDERI, Salvatore C. 108 Sunset Drive Westfield, MA 01085 / US | 03 /
SCUDERI, Stephen P. 1023 Shaker Road Westfield, MA 01085 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 07753110.1 | 15.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US06459 | Priority number, date | US20060785435P | 24.03.2006 Original published format: US 785435 P | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007111839 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1999349 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01P9/00, F01P11/00, F02B39/08, // F02B33/44 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
F02G5/04 (EP,US);
F02G5/02 (KR);
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F01P11/00 (KR);
F01P9/00 (KR);
F02B33/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | F01P9/00, F01P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABWÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG FÜR EINEN MOTOR MIT GETEILTEM ZYKLUS | [2008/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SPLIT-CYCLE ENGINE WASTE HEAT RECOVERY | [2008/50] | French: | SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR PERDUE POUR MOTEUR À CYCLE DIVISÉ | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 06.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3111799 (GRIEPENTROG HARTMUT DR) [X] 1-6 * figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [Y]JPH0754659 (TANEMURA MASAMI) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figure 6 *; | [XY]FR2424411 (MESSIER SA [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [I]FR2523212 (SARDOU MAX [FR]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004113700 (SCUDERI GROUP LLC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figure - * | International search | [Y]US4176630 (ELMER ARTHUR E H [GB]); | [Y]US5215044 (BANZHAF MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [Y]US6079373 (KAWAMURA HIDEO [JP]); | [AE]US2007266964 (SODERBERG PEHR [SE]); | [X]US5215044 (BANZHAF MATTHIAS [DE], et al) |