EP1998701 - CONTROLLED GUIDED ABLATION TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICALCV, INC. 9725 South Robert Trail Inver Grove Heights, MN 55077 / US | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Kevin, Charles 3911 Upton Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | 02 /
MESTER, Dana, Ray 4414 Helena Way N. Oakdale, MN 55128 / US | 03 /
BRUCKER, Gregory, G. 5029 Garfield Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US | 04 /
ASSELIN, Paul, Anthony 1927 Autumn Street Falcon Heights, MN 55113 / US | 05 /
CLAPP, Robert, W. 2316 19th Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | 06 /
BERMAN, Adam, L. 5301 Windsor Avenue Edina, MN 55436 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2008/50] | Vanzini, Christian, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07753392.5 | 19.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US06759 | Priority number, date | US20060385317 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 385317 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007109204 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1998701 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/24 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (EP,US);
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B5/0538 (EP,US);
A61B5/117 (EP);
A61B18/20 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00247 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3488 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00392 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00636 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESTEUERTE BEHANDLUNG MIT GEFÜHRTER ABLATION | [2008/50] | English: | CONTROLLED GUIDED ABLATION TREATMENT | [2008/50] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'ABLATION GUIDÉE CONTRÔLÉE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5360426 (MUELLER GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 4,10 * column 3, line 10 - line 45 *; | [Y]WO9634569 (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [Y] 7,11 * page 30, line 26 - page 31, line 7 *; | [Y]WO0103599 (CARDIOFOCUS INC [US], et al) [Y] 12* page 30, line 9 - page 31, line 10 *; | [Y]US2002022829 (NAGASE TORU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,6-9,13 * paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraphs [0151] - [0153] *; | [X]US2003060813 (LOEB MARVIN P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0058]; figures 2,5,7,8 * * paragraph [0073] *; | [XY]US2005209589 (BERMAN ADAM L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0092] , [0094] , [0118]; figures 1,3-15 * [Y] 2,4,6-13 | by applicant | US6237605 | US2002087151 | US6514250 | US6579285 | US2004006333 | US2004102771 | US2005096643 | US2005209589 |