EP1996185 - TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF SCARRING, CAPSULAR CONTRACTURES AND/OR HYPERPIGMENTATION USING LEUKOTRIENE RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND VITAMIN E [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlesinger, Larry 33 Lono Avenue 300 Kahului, Maui HI 96732 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina, et al Borenius & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Lönnqvist, Gunnel Solveig Kristina, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07753480.8 | 20.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US06854 | Priority number, date | US20060783398P | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 783398 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007109248 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996185 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61K31/355, A61K31/41, A61K31/35, A61K31/37, A61K31/47 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61K31/41 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61K31/473 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/41, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION DER VERNARBUNG, KAPSEL-KONTRAKTUREN UND/ODER HYPERPIGMENTIERUNGEN MIT LEUKOTRIENREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN UND VITAMIN E | [2008/49] | English: | TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF SCARRING, CAPSULAR CONTRACTURES AND/OR HYPERPIGMENTATION USING LEUKOTRIENE RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND VITAMIN E | [2008/49] | French: | TRAITEMENT OU PRÉVENTION DE LA CICATRISATION, DE CONTRACTURES CAPSULAIRES ET/OU D'UNE HYPERPIGMENTATION AU MOYEN D'UN ANTAGONISTE DU RÉCEPTEUR DE LEUKOTRIÈNE ET DE LA VITAMINE E | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6951869 ; | [Y]US6337076 ; | [Y]WO03094882 ; | [Y]WO03074019 | [Y] - REID R.R. ET AL., "The Effect of Zafirlukast (Accolate) on Early Capsular Contracture in the Primary Augmentation Patient: A Pilot Study", AESTHETIC SURGERY JOURNAL, (2005), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.asj.2004.12.003, pages 26 - 30, XP004753860 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.asj.2004.12.003 | [Y] - BAKER J.L., "The Effectiveness of Alpha-Tocopherol (Vitamin E) in Reducing the Incidence of Spherical Contracture around Breast Implants", PLAST RECONSTR. SURG., (1981), vol. 68, no. 5, pages 696 - 699 | [Y] - MORELLI J.G. ET AL., "Leukotriene B4-Induced Human Melanocyte Pigmentation and Leukotriene C4-Induced Human Melanocyte Growth Are Inhibited by Different Isoquinolinesulfonamides", J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1992), vol. 98, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1111/1523-1747.ep12494602, pages 55 - 58, XP008020580 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12494602 | [Y] - TOMITA Y. ET AL., "Melanocyte-Stimulating Properties of Arachidonic Acid Metabolites: Possible Role in Postinflammatory Pigmentation", PIGMENT CELL RES., (1992), vol. 5, no. 5, PART 2, pages 357 - 361, XP008020760 | [Y] - FUNASAKA Y. ET AL., "Depigmenting Effect of alpha-Tocopheryl Ferulate on Normal Human Melanocytes", PIGMENT CELL RES., (2000), vol. 13, no. SUPPL. 8, pages 170 - 174 |