EP1996688 - LIQUID TREATMENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANANDIKER, Rajan Keshav 4360 Tylers Estates Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
VETTER, Kerry Andrew 2769 Mahoning Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45233-4236 / US | 03 /
DUNLOP, David Scott 4364 South Mallard Cove Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
BRAECKMAN, Karl Ghislain Rue de la Chapelle 59 6280 Gerpinnes / BE | 05 /
DEPOOT, Karel Jozef Maria Oudenaardestraat 72 8570 Anzegem-vichte / BE | 06 /
COMBS, MaryJane 510 West Sixth Street Covington, Kentucky 41011 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/43] | Goodier, Claire-Louise N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2008/49] | Goodier, Claire-Louise NV Procter & Gamble Services SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 07753570.6 | 20.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US06952 | Priority number, date | US20060784826P | 22.03.2006 Original published format: US 784826 P | US20060815781P | 22.06.2006 Original published format: US 815781 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007111892 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996688 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996688 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/74, C11D3/20, C11D3/12, C11D3/40, C11D3/37, C11D3/22, C11D1/62 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C11D3/40 (EP,US);
C11D1/74 (EP,US);
C11D17/0013 (EP,US);
C11D17/003 (EP,US);
C11D17/043 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/0089 (EP,US);
C11D3/12 (EP,US);
C11D3/124 (EP,US);
C11D3/1293 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/221 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D3/225 (EP,US);
C11D3/227 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US);
C11D3/3734 (EP,US);
C11D3/3742 (EP,US);
C11D3/3749 (EP,US);
C11D3/3765 (EP,US);
C11D3/3773 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US);
C11D3/382 (EP,US);
C11D3/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE BEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/49] | English: | LIQUID TREATMENT COMPOSITION | [2008/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT LIQUIDE | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.04.2011 | 14.04.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Port Sunlight / Weena 455 Wirral, Merseyside CH62 42D / 3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative McHugh, Paul Edward Patent Department Unilever R&D Colworth Laboratory Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [2012/35] | 30.08.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.03.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.12.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2014 | 16.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.04.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | IE | 20.03.2012 | LU | 20.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4544498 (SUZUKI TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,10,17,18,22-25,29,30 * column 4; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0463780 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,17-20,22-27,29,30 * page 4; examples 1-3,8-11; claim - *; | [X]US5089148 (VAN BLARCOM DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,17,18,22-25,29,30 * column 6 - column 7; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0520551 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 11-16* example -; claim - *; | [XD]WO9816538 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1-30 * example -; claim - *; | [XD]WO0240627 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [XD] 1-30 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004014321 (RHODIA [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-15,17,18,22-25,29,30 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2004092425 (BOUTIQUE JEAN-POL [BE], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0182]; claim - *; | [X]US2004121930 (WANG JIPING [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004069980 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,11,13-15,17,18,22-25,29,30 * page 9; claim -; table - *; | [X]US2005158268 (SCHMUCKER-CASTNER JULIE F [US], et al) [X] 4-15,17-27,29,30 * paragraph [0100]; examples 1-3,5; claim - * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] * | by applicant | US2220099 | US2477383 | US3308067 | US3664961 | US3723322 | US3835163 | US3919678 | US3923679 | US4102903 | US4120874 | US4144226 | US4158635 | US4222905 | US4239659 | US4544498 | US4566984 | US4597898 | EP0200263 | US4717501 | US5017305 | EP0463780 | US5089148 | EP0520551 | US5445747 | US5500138 | EP0520551 | US5531910 | US5565145 | US5576282 | US5646101 | US5686014 | US5695679 | US5698504 | US5705464 | US5710115 | WO9816538 | US6080708 | WO0105874 | US6210659 | US6306812 | US6326348 | WO0218528 | WO0218451 | WO0240627 | US6491840 | WO2004014321 | US2004092425 | US2004121930 | WO2004069980 | US6833344 | US6835700 | US6903061 | US2005158268 | US2005164905 | US6956017 | US7022656 | - R. L. CROMBIE, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, vol. 19, pages 205 - 214 | - YOSHIAKI ONO, Silicones- Fields of Application and Technology Trends, SHIN-ETSU SILICONES LTD |