EP2008153 - MULTI-PORT OPTICAL PARAMETRIC OSCILLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE, GB | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Textron Systems Corporation 201 Lowell Street Wilmington, Massachusetts 01887 / US | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLATER, Richard Craig 37 Wyman Street Waban, Massachusetts 02468-9998 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Flutter, Paula, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Flutter, Paula, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07754550.7 | 30.03.2007 | [2010/11] | WO2007US08040 | Priority number, date | US20060790428P | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 790428 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007123781 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008153 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008153 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/39 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
G02F1/39 (EP,US);
H01S3/083 (EP,US);
G02F1/392 (EP,US);
G02F2201/16 (EP,US);
G02F2203/15 (EP,US);
H01S3/0816 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | G02F1/39, H01S3/08, H01S3/083 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/18] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER PARAMETRISCHER OSZILLATOR MIT MEHREREN PORTS | [2009/01] | English: | MULTI-PORT OPTICAL PARAMETRIC OSCILLATOR | [2009/01] | French: | OSCILLATEUR PARAMÉTRIQUE OPTIQUE MULTI-PORT | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.03.2011 | GB | 19.04.2011 | DE | 01.10.2011 | [2012/12] |
Former [2012/06] | FR | 31.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004109323 (ELOP ELECTRO OPTICAL IND LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * paragraphs [0109] - [0111]; figure 14 *; | [Y]WO2004049056 (UNIV MACQUARIE [AU], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 36, line 19 - page 38, line 15 * * page 49, line 25 - page 51, line 14 * * figures 3,21 *; | [A]US2003112493 (JOVANOVIC IGOR [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0022] - [0030]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003137719 (VAN DER VEER WYTZE EEUWKE [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figure 1 *; | [A]US5390211 (CLARK JAMES B [US], et al) [A] * abstract * | [A] - RUSSELL S M ET AL, "Optical parametric generation of greater than 30 mJ signal energies in PPLN stacks", CONF LASERS ELECTRO OPT EUR TECH DIG; CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS EUROPE - TECHNICAL DIGEST 2001, (2001), pages xlvii - xlviii, XP002447571 [A] 4,5 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004109323 |