EP2010045 - OPTICAL DETECTION OF DENTAL CARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Dental Technology Topco Limited Cleveland House 33 King Street London SW1Y 6RJ / GB | [2018/20] |
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Carestream Dental Technology Topco Limited Cleveland House 33King Street London SW1Y 6RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street, MC=01135 Rochester, New York 14608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Victor, C. 44 Brightwoods Lane Rochester, New York 14623 / US | 02 /
LIANG, Rongguang 16 Millford Crossing Penfield, New York 14526 / US | 03 /
MARCUS, Michael, Alan 9 Mendonshire Drive Honeoye Falls, New York 14472 / US | 04 /
MCLAUGHLIN, Paul, O. 100 Sylvan Road Rochester, New York 14618 / US | 05 /
PATTON, David, Lynn 414 Homestead Drive Lebanon, Pennsylvania 17042 / US | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07755065.5 | 09.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007US08663 | Priority number, date | US20060408360 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 408360 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007127036 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010045 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010045 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/0088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/20] |
Former [2009/22] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ERKENNUNG VON KARIES | [2009/02] | English: | OPTICAL DETECTION OF DENTAL CARIES | [2009/02] | French: | DÉTECTION OPTIQUE DE CARIES DENTAIRES | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 03.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5306144 (HIBST RAIMUND [DE], et al) [A] 1,34,41,42 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 40 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003156788 (HENNING THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,34,41,42 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014]; claim 24 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]US2004236232 (JONUSAUSKAS GEDIMINAS [FR], et al) [X] 34-41 * paragraphs [0007] - [0026] * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]WO2004104927 (INSPEKTOR RES SYSTEMS B V [NL], et al) [DA] 1,34,41,42* abstract *; | [X]US2005003323 (KATSUDA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-42 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0088] - [0121]; figures 1-7 * |