EP2134284 - SYSTEM FOR GUIDING INSTRUMENTS HAVING DIFFERENT SIZES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIELEN, Frans, L., H. Klompenstraat 10 NL-6251 NE Eckelrade / NL | 02 /
APPENRODT, Peter Klattenweg 58 28213 Bremen / DE | 03 /
VAN VENROOIJ, Paulus, Cornelis Hommerterweg 228 NL-6431 EZ Hoensbroek / NL | 04 /
DUYSENS, Victor Nieuwstraat 43 NL-6127 BA Grevenbicht / NL | [2010/07] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
GIELEN, Frans, L., H. Klompenstraat 10 NL-6251 NE Eckelrade / NL | ||
02 /
APPENRODT, Peter Schwachhauser Ring 49 28213 Bremen / DE | |||
03 /
VAN VENROOIJ, Paulus, Cornelis Hommerterweg 228 NL-6431 EZ Hoensbroek / NL | |||
04 /
DUYSENS, Victor Nieuwstraat 43 NL-6127 BA Grevenbicht / NL | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2018/51] |
Former [2009/52] | Edlund, Fabian Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 07755928.4 | 24.04.2007 | [2009/52] | WO2007US09857 | Priority number, date | US20070733362 | 10.04.2007 Original published format: US 733362 | US20070733368 | 10.04.2007 Original published format: US 733368 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008123855 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134284 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134284 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00, A61B17/34, A61B34/10, A61B34/20, A61B34/00, A61B90/11 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3407 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3411 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/374 (EP,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | A61B19/00, A61B17/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM FÜHREN VON INSTRUMENTEN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN GRÖSSEN | [2009/52] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GUIDING INSTRUMENTS HAVING DIFFERENT SIZES | [2009/52] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR GUIDER DES INSTRUMENTS DE DIFFÉRENTES TAILLES | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2018 | 25.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2007 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | ES | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | IT | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | GB | 24.04.2019 | IE | 24.04.2019 | LU | 24.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.04.2007 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0217810 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-12,15,16,19,25,27-29,33-35 * figures 3,4 ** page 9, line 20 - page 21, line 15 *; | [Y]US6491699 (HENDERSON JAIMIE [US], et al) [Y] 13,17,18,39 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 27 *; | [X]US2004243146 (CHESBROUGH RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,13,14,27-38 * figures 21-27 * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0103] *; | [XY]US2006229641 (GUPTA RAJIV [US], et al) [X] 1,5-12,14-16,19,25-36,38 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1A-8G * [Y] 13,17,18,39 | Examination | US2006122629 |