EP2023941 - PROTEIN CROSSLINKERS, CROSSLINKING METHODS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incept, LLC 6 Porter Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2016/51] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Incept, LLC 12 Idylwilde Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATHAK, Chandrashekhar, P. 4221 East Ray Road 2069 Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US | 02 /
SAWHNEY, Amarpreet, S. 6 Porter Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 03 /
DREHER, James, H. 744 San Lorenzo Santa Monica, CA 90402 / US | [2016/51] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
PATHAK, Chandrashekhar, P. 4221 East Ray Road 2069 Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US | ||
02 /
SAWHNEY, Amarpreet, S. 12 Idylwilde Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | |||
03 /
DREHER, James, H. 744 San Lorenzo Santa Monica, CA 90402 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/51] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07755963.1 | 24.04.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US09934 | Priority number, date | US20060794384P | 24.04.2006 Original published format: US 794384 P | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127198 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2023941 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023941 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/74, C07K14/00, C08F283/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61L24/0005 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61L24/0031 (EP,US);
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
A61L24/06 (EP,US);
A61L24/108 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/046, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
A61L24/06, C08L39/06 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/08] | A61K31/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEINVERNETZER, VERNETZUNGSVERFAHREN UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | [2009/08] | English: | PROTEIN CROSSLINKERS, CROSSLINKING METHODS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2009/08] | French: | AGENTS DE RÉTICULATION DE PROTÉINE, MÉTHODES DE RÉTICULATION ET LEURS APPLICATIONS | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 26.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2007 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | IE | 24.04.2017 | LU | 24.04.2017 | MT | 24.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.04.2007 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.04.2007 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0012018 (ADVANCED CLOSURE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-11 * pages 22,27 *; | [X]US2003012734 (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKHAR P [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9* paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0133]; figure 10 *; | [X]WO2006034128 (ANGIOTECH BIOMATERIALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5874500 (RHEE WOONZA M [US], et al); | [Y]US6815212 (NESS JEFFREY VAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4359049 | US4631055 | US4735616 | US4874368 | US4902281 | US4932942 | US4978336 | WO9109641 | US5116315 | US5410016 | US5540707 | US5874500 | US5935139 | US6050972 | US6152943 | US6165201 | US6326419 | US6371970 | US6566406 | US6632457 | US6800080 | US6846851 | US6875193 | US6958212 | - SCHLAG; REDL, FIBRIN SEALANT IN OPERATIVE SURGERY, (1986), vol. 1-7 | - TANGE, R.A., FIBRIN SEALANT IN OPERATIVE MEDICINE: OTOLARYNGOLOGY, (1986), vol. 1 |