EP2024429 - A COLORED ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE AND A PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro LLC 1 Covestro Circle Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [2015/44] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PYLES, Robert A. 432 Galway Drive Bethel Park, PA 15102-2306 / US | 02 /
ARCHEY, Rick L. 333 Old Clairton Road Pleasant Hills, PA 15236-4334 / US | 03 /
VENTURA, Joseph D. 109 Sundial Drive Cannonsburg, PA 15317 / US | 04 /
WITMAN, Mark W. 2526 Matterhorn Road Wexford, PA 15090-7962 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Klimiuk, Meike Bayer MaterialScience AG Law & Patents Patents and Licensing Gebäude Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Klimiuk, Meike Bayer MaterialScience AG LP/PL, Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07756013.4 | 26.04.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US10031 | Priority number, date | US20060417720 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 417720 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007130297 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2024429 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024429 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/06, B27K5/02, C03C17/32, C03C17/38, C08J7/06, D06P5/00, D06P1/651 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
B05D5/067 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/065 (EP,KR,US);
B05D5/00 (KR);
B05D5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/00 (KR);
B27K5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/32 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/06 (KR);
D06P1/60 (KR);
D06P1/65118 (EP,KR,US);
D06P5/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | C08J7/06, D06P1/60, D06P1/613, D06P1/651 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES FARBIGEN ARTIKELS UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/08] | English: | A COLORED ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE AND A PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION | [2009/08] | French: | ARTICLE MANUFACTURE COLORE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 14.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2007 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | IE | 26.04.2015 | LU | 26.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | GB | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.04.2007 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GB | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS56140193 ; | [X]FR2438703 (ROUSSEAU CLAUDE) [X] 19 * page 1, lines 1-7 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 37 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 13; claim - *; | [X]US4310330 (FUNAKI MASAAKI, et al) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 1 - column 8, line 68; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0081346 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) [X] 19 * page 1, lines 3-16 * * page 4, line 26 - page 8, line 33; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0587282 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]) [X] 19 * page 3, line 16 - page 8, line 16; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0014325 (RYSER CHRISTOPHE U [CA]) [X] 19 * page 3, line 6 - page 10, line 19; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2005061780 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 2, line 11 - page 29, line 9; claim - *; | [X]WO2005061597 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 1, lines 1-9 * * page 3, line 10 - page 8, line 28 * * page 15, line 24 - page 17, line 17 * * page 21, line 1 - page 33, line 18; claim - *; | [XP]EP1712581 (EMS CHEMIE AG [CH]) [XP] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [0033] - [0099]; claim - *; | [XP]WO2007025579 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,8,9,12-19* page 2, line 21 - page 28, line 6; claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 19, Database accession no. 1982-37835E, XP002462604 & JPS56140193 A 19811102 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 19 * abstract * |