EP2044763 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS TO FACILITATE MULTIMEDIA TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFIN, Jeffrey, Jason 10606 Friendly Neighbor Lane Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07756348.4 | 12.01.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US60463 | Priority number, date | US20060474205 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: US 474205 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007149596 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2044763 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/04, H04L29/06 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04M19/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG EINES MULTIMEDIATRANSFERS | [2009/15] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS TO FACILITATE MULTIMEDIA TRANSFER | [2009/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À FACILITER LE TRANSFERT DE MULTIMÉDIA | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005058133 (LEVI STEVEN P [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * figures 1-3,10 * * paragraphs [0037] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] *; | [PX]WO2006090211 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [PX] 1-29 * abstract *; | [PX]WO2006129148 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [PX] 1-29* abstract * |