EP1977059 - REVERSIBLE TENT RAINFLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COLEMAN COMPANY, INC. 3600 North Hydraulic Avenue Wichita, Kansas 67219 / US | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINZ, Trevor, J. 201 N. Ridgewood Wichita, Kansas 67208 / US | 02 /
MEETHER, Stuart, L. 14127 West Onewood Court Wichita, Kansas 67235 / US | 03 /
CULP, Yiyun 852 North Sagebrush Court Wichita, Kansas 67230 / US | 04 /
PETERSON, Michael, Wayne 4870 Wyndham Road Park City, Kansas 67291 / US | 05 /
SLATES, Rachelle, L. 5351 Midland Circle Wichita, Kansas 67217 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07756389.8 | 22.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007US60826 | Priority number, date | US20060762152P | 25.01.2006 Original published format: US 762152 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007095409 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977059 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/54 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
E04H15/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMKEHRBARE AUSSENZELTPLANE | [2008/41] | English: | REVERSIBLE TENT RAINFLY | [2008/41] | French: | DOUBLE-TOIT REVERSIBLE POUR TENTE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 28.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6194329 (NELSON STEVE [US], et al); | [Y]US5582197 (DOBBERSTEIN STEVEN E [US]); | [Y]US4562108 (MIYAKE MASAO [JP], et al); | [A]US5176421 (FASISKA EDWARD J [US]); | [A]US6037280 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) |