EP2020841 - COMBINE HARVESTER DRAPER HEADER HAVING FLEXIBLE CUTTERBAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGCO CORPORATION 4205 River Green Parkway Duluth GA 30096 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states AGCO CORPORATION 4205 River Green Parkway Duluth GA 30096 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, James, R. 6455 Busybee Lane Andale, KS 67001 / US | 02 /
SAUERWEIN, Christopher, T. 3320 N. Hillside Road Newton, KS 67114 / US | 03 /
LOHRENTZ, Randy 13412 E. Avenue Buhler, KS 67522 / US | 04 /
REGIER, Bernard, D. 14318 N.W. 160th Newton, KS 67114 / US | 05 /
CLARK, Stanley, R. 8029 West Dutch Avenue Hesston, KS 67062 / US | 06 /
BERGKAMP, Alan, R. 2273 Comanche Road Galva, KS 67443 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [2013/35] |
Former [2009/07] | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07756629.7 | 02.02.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US61557 | Priority number, date | US20060771981P | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 771981 P | US20070670295 | 01.02.2007 Original published format: US 670295 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007095430 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020841 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020841 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01D43/00, A01D41/14, A01D57/20 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
A01D41/14 (EP,GB,US);
A01D43/06 (US);
A01D43/00 (GB);
A01D57/20 (EP,GB,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | A01D43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAPIERKOPF FÜR EINE KOMBINIERTE ERNTEMASCHINE MIT FLEXIBLER SCHNEIDEKLINGE | [2009/07] | English: | COMBINE HARVESTER DRAPER HEADER HAVING FLEXIBLE CUTTERBAR | [2009/07] | French: | TETE DE TULOTEUSE DE MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE AYANT UNE BARRE DE COUPE FLEXIBLE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 21.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13179856.3 / EP2684441 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | GB | 02.02.2014 | IE | 02.02.2014 | LU | 02.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 02.02.2014 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 02.02.2014 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
PT | 30.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2347365 (PARADISE LOUIS A); | [X]US4956966 (PATTERSON ROGER L [CA]) | International search | [X]US1996294 (HUME HORACE D, et al); | [X]US2099471 (EDGINGTON AARON D); | [X]US2438065 (LOVE JAMES E); | [X]US2003074876 (PATTERSON ROGER L [CA], et al); | [X]US2007204589 (COERS BRUCE A [US], et al) |