EP1991685 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INCREASING PLANT TOLERANCE TO HIGH POPULATION DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, IA 50131-1014 / US | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, IA 50131-1014 / US | ||
For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | |||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATE, Nicholas, J. 7813 Claiborne Circle Urbandale, Iowa 50322 / US | 02 /
AUKERMAN, Milo, J. 1203 Delpa Drive Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/20] |
Former [2008/47] | Bentham, Andrew, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07758034.8 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US63445 | Priority number, date | US20060779720P | 07.03.2006 Original published format: US 779720 P | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007103956 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991685 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991685 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/415 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VERTRÄGLICHKEIT VON PFLANZEN GEGENÜBER HOHEN POPULATIONSDICHTEN | [2008/47] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INCREASING PLANT TOLERANCE TO HIGH POPULATION DENSITY | [2008/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'ACCROISSEMENT DE LA TOLÉRANCE DES PLANTES À UNE DENSITÉ DE POPULATION ÉLEVÉE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2007 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | IT | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | ES | 27.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
ES | 27.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X] - "Arabidopsis thaliana genomic DNA, chromosome 5, P1 clone:MHM17.", EMBL, (19990305), Database accession no. AB024035, URL: EBI, XP002460248 [X] 15-22 * CDS Q9LTS4; page 3 * | [X] - "Gb AAC78547.1.", UniProt, (20001001), Database accession no. Q9LTS4, URL: EBI, XP002460249 [X] 15-22 * the whole document * | [DXA] - LIU XING LIANG ET AL, "ELF3 encodes a circadian clock-regulated nuclear protein that functions in an Arabidopsis PHYB signal transduction pathway", PLANT CELL, (200106), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1293 - 1304, XP009092714 [DX] 15-24 * the whole document * [A] 1-14 | [DXA] - COVINGTON MICHAEL F ET AL, "ELF3 modulates resetting of the circadian clock in Arabidopsis", PLANT CELL, (200106), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 1305 - 1315, XP009092715 [DX] 15-24 [A] 1-14 | [A] - BOCCALANDRO HERNAN E ET AL, "Increased phytochrome B alleviates density effects on tuber yield of field potato crops.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), (200312), vol. 133, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1539 - 1546, XP009092713 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.103.029579 | [A] - AJAY K GARG ET AL, "Light-regulated overexpression of an Arabidopsis phytochrome A gene in rice alters plant architecture and increases grain yield", PLANTA ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (20050901), vol. 223, no. 4, ISSN 1432-2048, pages 627 - 636, XP019427373 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - ROBSON P R H ET AL, "GENETIC ENGINEERING OF HARVEST INDEX IN TOBACCO THROUGH OVEREXPRESSION OF A PHYTOCHROME GENE", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING CO. NEW YORK, US, (199608), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 995 - 998, XP001056561 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0896-995 | [A] - SAWERS R J H ET AL, "Cereal phytochromes: targets of selection, targets for manipulation?", TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (200503), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1360-1385, pages 138 - 143, XP004776175 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - FRANKLIN KEARA A ET AL, "Phytochromes and shade-avoidance responses in plants", ANNALS OF BOTANY (LONDON), (200508), vol. 96, no. 2, ISSN 0305-7364, pages 169 - 175, XP009092712 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/aob/mci165 | [PA] - ROUX ET AL, "How to be early flowering: an evolutionary perspective", TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (200608), vol. 11, no. 8, ISSN 1360-1385, pages 375 - 381, XP005667187 [PA] 1-14 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tplants.2006.06.006 | [A] - "ii93d09.g1 WGS-ZmaysF (DH5a methyl filtered) Zea mays genomic clone ii93d09, DNA sequence.", EMBL, (20030430), Database accession no. CC169680, URL: EBI, XP002460247 [A] 23 * the whole document * | [PA] - PAGANO ET AL, "Intra-specific competition in maize: Early established hierarchies differ in plant growth and biomass partitioning to the ear around silking", FIELD CROPS RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070208), vol. 101, no. 3, ISSN 0378-4290, pages 306 - 320, XP005879674 [PA] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fcr.2006.12.007 |