EP1996599 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BISPHOSPHONIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albemarle Corporation 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMSEL, Edward, G. 936 Louray Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | 02 /
WU, Tse-chong 17613 Eaglewood Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07758698.0 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US64176 | Priority number, date | US20060784752P | 21.03.2006 Original published format: US 784752 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007109542 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996599 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6506 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C07F9/386 (EP,US);
C07F9/3873 (EP,US);
C07F9/58 (EP,US);
C07F9/6506 (EP,US);
C07F9/6561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BISPHOSPHONSÄUREN | [2008/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING BISPHOSPHONIC ACIDS | [2008/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ACIDES BISPHOSPHONIQUES | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005044831 (SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 24 * * example 7 *; | [A]WO2005066188 (SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, paragraph 4 *; | [A]WO9834940 (APOTEX INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO02090367 (EOS ECZACIBASI OZGUN KIMYASAL [TR], et al) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 * |