EP1999465 - CERAMIC-BASED CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/50] | CERAMIC-BASED CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
[2016/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Corporation 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Waters Investments Limited 109 Lukens Drive New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERHARDT, Geoff, C. 8 Brian Circle Millbury, MA 01527 / US | 02 /
MICHIENZI, Joseph 9 Millbrook Avenue Plainville, MA 02762 / US | 03 /
BENEVIDES, Christopher, C. 56 Cross Road Tiverton, MA 02878 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Buchenstrasse 17 82064 Straßlach-Dingharting / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/25] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Intellectual Property Law Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07758780.6 | 19.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US64267 | Priority number, date | US20060785866P | 24.03.2006 Original published format: US 785866 P | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007112224 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1999465 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1999465 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/60 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G01N30/606 (EP,US);
G01N30/6095 (EP,US);
G01N30/6026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | G01N30/00, G01N30/90 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/46] |
Former [2009/17] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CHROMATOGRAPHIEVORRICHTUNG AUF KERAMIKBASIS | [2016/24] | English: | CERAMIC-BASED CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS | [2016/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE À BASE DE CÉRAMIQUE | [2016/24] |
Former [2008/50] | CHROMATOGRAPHIEVORRICHTUNG AUF KERAMIKBASIS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2008/50] | CERAMIC-BASED CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
Former [2008/50] | APPAREIL DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE À BASE DE CÉRAMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DUDIT APPAREIL | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 25.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004089607 (HOBBS STEVEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1A,1B,2; claims 1-33 * | [X] - OBERACHER H ET AL, "Preparation and evaluation of packed capillary columns for the separation of nucleic acids by ion-pair reversed-phase high-performance liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20000929), vol. 893, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00731-7, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 23 - 35, XP004210371 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 25 - page 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00731-7 | International search | [X]US5540834 (CARR PETER W [US], et al); | [Y]US2005045559 (WANG QUINJIE [US], et al); | [Y]US6987263 (HOBBS STEVEN E [US], et al); | [Y]US6929030 (UNGER MARC A [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004089607 | US5540834 | US2005254967 | US7094326 | - OBERACHER ET AL:, "Preparation and evaluation of packed capillary columns for the separation of nucleic acids by ion-pair reversed-phase high-performance liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, vol. 893, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00731-7, pages 23 - 35, XP004210371 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00731-7 |