EP1996092 - CANNULA STABILIZATION SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION 22872 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION 22872 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HART, Charles, C. 126 Marvin Gardens Summerville, SC 29483-8949 / US | 02 /
AU, Gigi 2045 Heather Dr. Monterey Park, CA 91755 / US | 03 /
PRAVONGVIENGKHAM, Kennii 19660 Berrywood Dr. Lake Elsinore, CA 92530 / US | 04 /
ALBRECHT, Jeremy, J. 27082 O'Neill Dr. 220 Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | [2014/01] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
HART, Charles, C. 126 Marvin Gardens Summerville, SC 29483-8949 / US | ||
02 /
AU, Gigi 2045 Heather Dr. Monterey Park, CA 91755 / US | |||
03 /
PRAVONGVIENGKHAM, Kennii 19660 Berrywood Dr. Lake Elsinore, CA 92530 / US | |||
04 /
ALBRECHT, Jeremy, J. 27082 O'Neill Dr. 220 Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [2014/02] |
Former [2008/49] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2008/42] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07758971.1 | 21.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US64471 | Priority number, date | US20060277116 | 21.03.2006 Original published format: US 277116 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007109700 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996092 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996092 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/3421 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3419 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3486 (EP,US);
A61B2017/349 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3492 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/17] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANÜLENSTABILISIERUNGSDICHTUNG | [2008/49] | English: | CANNULA STABILIZATION SEAL | [2008/49] | French: | JOINT DE STABILISATION DE CANULE | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 22.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13151031.5 / EP2586389 | EP15156361.6 / EP2891463 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005165432 (HEINRICH RUSSELL [US]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044]; figures 5-7 *; | [Y]US4686985 (LOTTICK EDWARD A [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 6, line 11 - line 15; figures 6,7,13,14 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 62; figures 13,14 *; | [A]US5445615 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 1,11,16 * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 8; figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2003139758 (HOPPER PHILLIP K [US], et al) [A] 1,11,16 * abstract *; | [A]US4555242 (SAUDAGAR ABDUL S [US]) [A] 1,11,16 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 11; figure 2 *; | [A]US2004243167 (TANAKA SHIGERU [US], et al) [A] 1,11,16 * paragraph [0058] * | Examination | US2005216028 |