EP2002460 - SURFACE TREATMENTS FOR SPIRAL BEVEL GEAR SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TIMKEN COMPANY 1835 Dueber Avenue, S.W. Canton, Ohio 44706 / US | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOKE, Elizabeth P. 16 Pleasant Street Lyme, New Hampshire 03768 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Ryan D. 5065 Techwood Street North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 03 /
DOLL, Gary L. 6516 Pebble Creek Avenue NW Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | 04 /
KRUSE, Randy P. 1510 Radford Street NE North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 05 /
RIBAUDO, Carl R. 8221 Bricker Road NW Massillon, Ohio 44646 / US | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Marles, Alan David Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07759235.0 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007US64774 | Priority number, date | US20060785298P | 23.03.2006 Original published format: US 785298 P | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007109784 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002460 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002460 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C28/00, C23C14/48, C23C18/32, C25D3/12, F16H55/06 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
C25D3/12 (EP,US);
C23C18/32 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C28/046 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,US);
C23C28/324 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,US);
C23C28/343 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
C23C28/347 (EP,US);
C25D7/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGEN FÜR SPIRALFÖRMIGE UND ABGESCHRÄGTE GETRIEBEEINHEITEN | [2008/51] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENTS FOR SPIRAL BEVEL GEAR SETS | [2008/51] | French: | TRAITEMENTS DE SURFACE POUR ENSEMBLES ENGRENAGE SPIRO-CONIQUES | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2010 | BE | 16.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | CZ | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | EE | 16.06.2010 | FI | 16.06.2010 | HU | 16.06.2010 | IT | 16.06.2010 | LT | 16.06.2010 | LV | 16.06.2010 | MT | 16.06.2010 | NL | 16.06.2010 | RO | 16.06.2010 | SE | 16.06.2010 | SI | 16.06.2010 | SK | 16.06.2010 | TR | 16.06.2010 | BG | 16.09.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | ES | 27.09.2010 | IS | 16.10.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
HU | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04119249 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 8,9,17,18 * abstract *; | [X]US5404060 (NAKAHASHI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 56; claims 14,15 *; | [A]JPH1019092 (HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS) [A] 8,9,17,18 * abstract *; | [X]US2002174741 (KOBAYASHI MASARU [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-16 * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] , [0034] , [0035] , [0040] , [0055] *; | [A]US2005061251 (WEI RONGHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0022] , [0023] *; | [X]WO2005100810 (TIMKEN CO [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - WANG S Y ET AL, "Enhancement of surface properties of 45<#> carbon steel using plasma immersion ion implantation", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19971231), vol. 311, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 190 - 195, XP004121341 [X] 1-16 * page 194, column L; tables 6,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(97)00465-3 | [A] - TEETER F J ET AL, "WEAR PROTECTION FOR GEARS", GEAR TECHNOLOGY, RANDALL PUBLISHING CO. ELK GROVE, ILLINOIS, US, (19960301), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0743-6858, pages 27 - 29, XP000550309 [A] 8,9,17,18 * page 28, column R, lines 13-15; figure 3 * | [A] - ZHAOMING ZENG ET AL, "Plasma immersion ion implantation of industrial gears", SURFACE & COATINGS TECHNOLOGY ELSEVIER SWITZERLAND, (20040802), vol. 186, no. 1-2, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 260 - 264, XP002448812 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2004.02.048 | Examination | US4095003 | - CONSTANTIN R.; MIREMAD B., "Performance of hard coatings, made by balanced and unbalanced magnetron sputtering, for decorative applications", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER [CH], (199911), vol. 120-121, pages 728 - 733 |