EP1998934 - POWER TOOL WITH IMPROVED START ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2013/03] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states THE STANLEY WORKS 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVERDING, James 8318 Bellflower Road Mentor, OH 44060 / US | 02 /
PANKEY, Glen, A. 383 Cove View Drive Waterford, MI 48327 / US | 03 /
BOOKSHAR, Duane 1036 Ford Road Highland Heights, OH 44143 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas Black & Decker European Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/26] | Stentiford, Andrew Charles Black & Decker Europe European Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2008/50] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07759238.4 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US64777 | Priority number, date | US20060785380P | 24.03.2006 Original published format: US 785380 P | US20060612714 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: US 612714 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007112303 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998934 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998934 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00, B25F5/00, F16P3/20 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
B25B21/00 (EP,US);
B25F5/00 (EP,US);
F16P3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROWERKZEUG MIT VERBESSERTEM START-AKTUATOR | [2008/50] | English: | POWER TOOL WITH IMPROVED START ACTUATOR | [2008/50] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN ACTIONNEUR DE MISE EN MARCHE AMÉLIORÉ | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 23.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2007 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | GB | 23.03.2014 | IE | 23.03.2014 | LU | 23.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5251706 (EVANS JACK [US]) [X] 1-7,10,12 * column 6, lines 19-39; figures 4,5 *; | [A]GB2185209 (FOX JOHN KELLY) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 85-90; figures 58,59 *; | [A]US3995477 (ALMOND BARRY) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 25-33; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0052185 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE19617882 (METABOWERKE KG [DE]) [X] 14-21 * page 1, lines 29-45 * * abstract * | by applicant | US5251706 | DE19617882 |