EP2005268 - SYSTEM AND METHOD TO ALLOW NON-DETERMINISTIC EXECUTION IN A PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. Law Dept. AB/2B, 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Gary L. 4823 W. Waltann Lane Glendale, Arizona 85306 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Lawrence L. 2141 W. Darrell Road Phoenix, Arizona 85041 / US | 03 /
MCNULTY, Robert J. 17422 N. 54th Lane Glendale, Arizona 85308 / US | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2011/09] |
Former [2008/52] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07759271.5 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007US64812 | Priority number, date | US20060390911 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: US 390911 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007112315 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005268 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G05B19/4185 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23115 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25342 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25367 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34404 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/17] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER NICHTDETERMINISTISCHEN AUSFÜHRUNG IN EINEM PROZESSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/52] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO ALLOW NON-DETERMINISTIC EXECUTION IN A PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM | [2008/52] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT L'EXÉCUTION NON DÉTERMINISTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 29.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 21.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1116077 (SCHNEIDER AUTOMATION [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0047] *; | [X]US2004098141 (MARTIN DAVID E [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0030] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0050] *; | [X]US6799077 (HAUET JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - GOLDBERG K ET AL, "Beyond the Web: manipulating the real world", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199512), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 209 - 219, XP004001227 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00094-8 |