EP2004493 - NON-WOVEN SELF-WRAPPING ACOUSTIC SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hiroki 4-21-6-502 Kamitsuruma Honcho Sagamihara/ Kangagawa, 228-0818 / JP | 02 /
INAMURA, Tomonori 4-12-5-A Tsukushino Machida-Shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
HASHIMOTO, Koushiro 2482-3, Inokuchi Nakai-Machi, Kanagawa / JP | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hiroki 4-21-6-502 Kamitsuruma Honcho Sagamihara/ Kangagawa, 228-0818 / JP | ||
02 /
INAMURA, Tomonori 4-12-5-A Tsukushino Machida-Shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
HASHIMOTO, Koushiro 2482-3, Inokuchi Nakai-Machi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hiroki 4-21-6-502 Kamitsuruma Honcho Sagamihara/ Kangagawa, 228-0818 / JP | ||
02 /
INAMURA, Tomonori 4-12-5-A Tsukushino Machida-Shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
HASHIMOTO, Koushiro 4-2-718 Midurigaoka Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hiroki 4-21-6-502 Kamitsuruma Honcho Sagamihara/ Kangagawa, 228-0818 / JP | ||
02 /
INAMURA, Tomonori 4-12-5-A Tsukushino Machida-Shi Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
HASHIMOTO, Koushiro 4-2-718 Midurigaoka Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07760378.5 | 10.04.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007US66305 | Priority number, date | US20060790733P | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 790733 P | US20070697836 | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 697836 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007121164 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2004493 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2004493 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
B60R16/0215 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (KR);
B65B13/00 (KR);
B65B13/02 (KR);
D04H18/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1328 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | B65B13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/19] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTWICKELNDE VLIES-AKUSTIKHÜLLE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/52] | English: | NON-WOVEN SELF-WRAPPING ACOUSTIC SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF | [2008/52] | French: | MANCHON ACOUSTIQUE AUTO-ENROULEUR EN NON-TISSE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 11.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2746953 (PLASTO SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,12,13,15 * page 2, lines 18-25 * * page 4, lines 25-29 * * page 6, line 3; claim 11 * [A] 3,5,7,9; | [XA]FR2745429 (SOFANOU SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 3-5 * * page 6, lines 3-12; claim 6 * [A] 6,12; | [X]US4970351 (KIRLIN RICK J [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - line 45 *; | [A]DE29823462U (HAENSEL VERBUNDTECHNIK GMBH & [DE]) [A] 2,4 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph L * * claims 25,32 *; | [A]FR2753654 (PLASTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-6,12,13 * abstract * * page 2, lines 9-15,23-34 * * page 3, line 10 - line 32 * * page 4, line 16 - line 25 * * page 6, lines 4-36; figure 5 * | International search | [X]US5796045 (LANCIEN JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al); | [Y]US3909893 (WILDE JOHN CLARKE) | by applicant | FR2746953 |