EP2872804 - ACTIVE VALVE AND METHODS OF OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Corporation 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOURDEVILLE, Theodore 29 Bell Guzzle Lane Marion, MA 02738 / US | 02 /
RUBINO, Frank, A. 186 Jefferson Street North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 03 /
JOUDREY, Kurt, D. 220 Cherry Street Newton, MA 02465 / US | 04 /
LUONGO, Joseph, A. 220 Cherry Street Newton, MA 02465 / US | 05 /
ANGELOSANTO, John 426 Kelley Blvd North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07760466.8 | 11.04.2007 | [2017/48] | WO2007US66412 | Priority number, date | US20060791804P | 12.04.2006 Original published format: US 791804 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007121230 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2872804 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872804 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16K21/04, F16K15/00, F16K17/00, F16K37/00, F04B7/00, F16K15/18, F16K31/04 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
F16K31/047 (EP,US);
F16K15/1823 (EP,US);
F04B7/0076 (EP,US);
F16K37/0041 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0318 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2015/21] | Title | German: | AKTIVVENTIL UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2015/21] | English: | ACTIVE VALVE AND METHODS OF OPERATION THEREOF | [2015/21] | French: | SOUPAPE ACTIVE ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 28.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0328696 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 45; figures 2,3 * [Y] 9-15; | [X]US2004069305 (NIEMELA TAPANI [SE], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0060]; figure - *; | [X]US2868494 (KEARNS JR CHARLES M, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 24 - column 5, line 12; figure - *; | [Y]EP0933571 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [Y] 9-11 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023]; figure - *; | [Y]US6904935 (WELTY RICHARD P [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 15; figure - *; | [A]GB2265228 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,9-11 * page 5, line 19 - page 8, line 16; figure - * | International search | [X]US2004069305 (NIEMELA TAPANI [SE], et al); | [Y]US6514047 (BURR RONALD FREDERICK [US], et al); | [Y]US5011113 (STOBBS THOMAS J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005126306 (WANG CHIUN [US], et al); | [Y]US6904935 (WELTY RICHARD P [US], et al); | [Y]US4045343 (ACHENER PIERRE Y, et al); | [Y]US5577970 (SMITH FRANKLIN R [US], et al); | [Y]US4496287 (NELSON ROBERT M [US], et al) |