EP2164433 - TETHERED AIRWAY IMPLANTS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pavad Medical, Inc. 40539 Encyclopedia Circle Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEGDE, Anant, V 1115 Silver Maple Lane Hayward, CA 94544 / US | 02 /
LI, Kasey, Kai-Chi 1284 Forest Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
BHAT, Nikhil, D. 2942 Cheswycke Terrace No. 357 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 04 /
KIM, Doyeon 1550 Springtown Blvd., No. 14-B Livermore, CA 94551 / US | 05 /
CHOI, George, Y. 3239 Oak Knoll Drive Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07761048.3 | 20.04.2007 | [2010/12] | WO2007US67130 | Priority number, date | US20060745254P | 20.04.2006 Original published format: US 745254 P | US20070737107 | 18.04.2007 Original published format: US 737107 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/12] | US20060745254P | 20.04.2006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008014028 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2164433 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61F5/56 (EP,US);
A61F5/566 (EP,US);
H02N1/008 (EP,US);
A61B2017/248 (EP,US);
G02B26/0841 (EP,US);
Y10S602/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | VERANKERTE ATEMWEGSIMPLANTATE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2010/12] | English: | TETHERED AIRWAY IMPLANTS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2010/12] | French: | IMPLANTS POUR VOIE RESPIRATOIRE ANCRÉS ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT LESDITS IMPLANTS | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 24.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2011 | 30.04.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005092334 (CONRAD TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraphs [0038] - [0045]; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-5,7-9,11; | [I]US2006060207 (HEGDE ANANT V [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2004021870 (APNEON INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 35, line 26 - page 36, line 25; figure 31 *; | [A]US2001050085 (KNUDSON MARK B [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0104] - [0107]; figures 46-49 * | International search | [X]US5792067 (KARELL MANUEL L [US]) | by applicant | US20060745254 |