EP2022274 - GENERATION OF VALID PROGRAM CLOCK REFERENCE TIME STAMPS FOR DUPLICATE TRANSPORT STREAM PACKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2018/08] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODWARD, William, D. 1171 Timberglen Court Lilburn, Georgia 30047 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2019/46] |
Former [2010/33] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 07762077.1 | 14.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US68639 | Priority number, date | US20060419414 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 419414 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007137002 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2022274 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022274 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/242 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H04N21/23617 (EP,US);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | H04N7/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2019/46] |
Former [2009/25] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG GÜLTIGER PROGRAMMTAKT-REFERENZZEITSTEMPEL FÜR DUPLIZIERTE ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTROMPAKETE | [2009/07] | English: | GENERATION OF VALID PROGRAM CLOCK REFERENCE TIME STAMPS FOR DUPLICATE TRANSPORT STREAM PACKETS | [2009/07] | French: | GENERATION D'HORODATAGES VALIDES D'HORLOGE DE REFERENCE DE PROGRAMME POUR PAQUETS DUPLIQUES DE FLUX DE TRANSPORT | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 20.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.11.2019 | [2020/24] | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1478184 (RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA [IT]) [X] 1-3,7-10 * [0023], [0026] * * claims 3,5 * [Y] 4-6,11-15; | [X]US2005039064 (BALAKRISHNAN JEYENDRAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * [0023], [0047], [0055]-[0060], [0073] *; | [A]US2005041661 (THORSTEINSON THOMAS M [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,7-10 * [0017], [0052], [0053] *; | [A]US2005094809 (PEDLOW LEO M JR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** [0090] *; | [A]US2005180732 (ONO TACHIO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * [0054]-[0059], [0062] *; | [XY] - "INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION: SYSTEMS. TECHNOLOGIES DE L'INFORMATION - CODAGE DES IMAGES ANIMEES ET DU SON ASSOCIE: SYSTEMES", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC, (19960415), vol. 13818-1, pages I - XY,1, XP000667435 [X] 1-3,7-10 * page 20, paragraph 3 * * section 2.4.2.2 * [Y] 4-6,11-15 |