EP2018341 - MOBILE LIFT CRANE WITH LIFT ENHANCING ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manitowoc Crane Companies, LLC 2400 South 44th Street Manitowoc WI 54221-0066 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Manitowoc Crane Companies, Inc. 50 West Liberty Street, Suite 1060 Reno Nevada 89501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PECH, David, J. 1610 Cherry Road Manitowoc, WI 54220 / US | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/05] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762113.4 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007US68738 | Priority number, date | US20060799915P | 12.05.2006 Original published format: US 799915 P | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007134211 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018341 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018341 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/74 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B66C23/74 (EP,KR);
B66C23/36 (KR);
B66C23/72 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2015/44] |
Former [2009/45] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOBILER HEBEKRAN MIT HEBEVERLÄNGERNDEM ANBAUTEIL | [2009/05] | English: | MOBILE LIFT CRANE WITH LIFT ENHANCING ATTACHMENT | [2009/05] | French: | GRUE DE LEVAGE MOBILE À FIXATION AMÉLIORANT LE LEVAGE | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 13.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | [2016/21] |
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4537317 (JENSEN LYLE B [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * the whole document * [I] 9,11,15; | [X]DE1264010 (GROSS G M B H A, et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US3868022 (GREENLAY ROY, et al) [X] 1-3, 7-9, 11-14, 18-20 * , see figures 1-5. *; | [X]US4382519 (BEDUHN DANIEL E, et al) [X] 1-5, 7, 8, 10, 17, 18 * , see entire document. *; | [X]US4387814 (BEDUHN DANIEL E, et al) [X] 1-8, 10, 14, 15, 17, 18 * , see entire document. *; | [X]US4579234 (DELAGO PIERRE C [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 7, 8, 15, 16 * , see entire document. * | by applicant | US4537317 |