EP2026753 - Compositions comprising glyceryl salicylate compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/09] | GLYCERYL AND GLYCOL ACID COMPOUNDS | ||
[2012/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mary Kay Inc. 16251 Dallas Parkway P.O. Box 799045 Dallas, TX 75379-9045 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Mary Kay, Inc. 16251 Dallas Parkway P.O. Box 799045 Dallas, TX 75379-9045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENTLIK, Anton, A. 1809 Rolling Ridge Drive Grapevine, TX 76051 / US | 02 /
SWANZE, James 2807 Wildplum Drive Arlington, TX 76015 / US | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Nohlen, Martin Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Nohlen, Martin Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Nohlen, Martin Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07762239.7 | 17.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US69160 | Priority number, date | US20060747760P | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 747760 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007137128 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026753 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026753 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/37, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (KR,US);
A61K8/0216 (US);
A61K8/06 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | A61K8/37, A61Q17/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Zubereitungen enthaltend Glycerylsalicylatverbindungen | [2012/07] | English: | Compositions comprising glyceryl salicylate compounds | [2012/07] | French: | Compositions contenant des composés glycéryle salicylate | [2012/07] |
Former [2009/09] | GLYCERYL- UND GLYKOLSÄUREVERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2009/09] | GLYCERYL AND GLYCOL ACID COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2009/09] | COMPOSÉS ACIDE/GLYCÉRYLE ET ACIDE/GLYCOL | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 28.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2007 | AT | 11.04.2012 | BE | 11.04.2012 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | LT | 11.04.2012 | LV | 11.04.2012 | MT | 11.04.2012 | PL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | IE | 17.05.2012 | LU | 17.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | IS | 11.08.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
LU | 17.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 11.04.2012 | |
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 11.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2081117 (HALL ROBERT A) [X] 1-36 * column W *; | [X]US2279468 (GUSTAVE LAHOUSSE JOSEPH EDOUAR, et al) [X] 1,23,27-36 * example 1; claims 1,3 *; | [X]US4009254 (RENOLD ADOLPH) [X] 1,2,23,26-36 * example 7; claims 1,4 * * column 5, lines 54,55 ** column 4, lines 37-45 *; | [X]GB2283173 (SANSHO SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,23,24,27-36 * page 4, paragraph L; examples 5,14,23; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0226207 (IDI IRCCS [IT], et al) [X] 1,23-25,27-36 * page 1, lines 1-6; examples 2-10; claim - * * page 3, lines 28-31 * * page 4, lines 9-16 *; | [X]EP1421940 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,23-25,27-36 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0012] , [0013] , [0040]; claims 1-3; tables 1-4 * |