EP2033471 - INTERLACE-BASED CONTROL CHANNEL BALANCING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei 12543 El Camino Real San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
KHANDEKAR, Aamod c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei 12543 El Camino Real San Diego, California 92130 / US | ||
02 /
KHANDEKAR, Aamod, Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | |||
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei 12543 El Camino Real San Diego, California 92130 / US | ||
02 /
KHANDEKAR, Aamod 8465 Regents Road, 339 San Diego, California 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07762244.7 | 18.05.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US69239 | Priority number, date | US20060801797P | 18.05.2006 Original published format: US 801797 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007137160 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2033471 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/28, H04W72/12, // H04W52/32, H04W52/34, H04W52/36 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H04W52/281 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/28 (KR);
H04W72/52 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/322 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/343 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/11] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF VERSCHACHTELUNG BASIERENDER STEUERKANALAUSGLEICH IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2009/11] | English: | INTERLACE-BASED CONTROL CHANNEL BALANCING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2009/11] | French: | ÉQUILIBRAGE DE VOIE DE SIGNALISATION AVEC ENTRELACEMENT DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1005243 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-46 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0014] , [0015] , [0019] - [0033] *; | [A]WO0108438 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-46 * abstract * * page 2, lines 16-26 * * page 4, lines 25-29 * * page 7, line 20 - page 11, line 4 * * page 15, line 3 - page 17, line 15 *; | [X]US2006072533 (SMEE JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0009] - [0021] , [0034] , [0035] , [0040] - [0061] - [0067] - [0074] - [0081] - [0086] *; | [A] - JIM TOMCIK, "QFDD Technbology Overview Presentation", INTERNET CITATION, (20051115), URL: http://ieee802.org/20/Contribs/C802.20-05-59r1.pdf, (20070227), XP002422346 [A] 1-46 * pages 5,6,11 * * pages 13,21,23 * * pages 26,30-32 * * pages 36,38 * * pages 40-43 * * pages 46-49 * * pages 54-62,73 * | by applicant | US2006072533 |