EP2020953 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SINGLE TOOTH REPLACEMENT IN A GROWING INDIVIDUAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graham, John W. 2036 S. 1300 E., Suite D. Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | [2012/41] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states ORMCO CORPORATION 1717 W. Collins Avenue Orange, CA 92867 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/41] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
GRAHAM, John, W. 302 W. Flynn Lane Phoenix, AZ 85013 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762353.6 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US69949 | Priority number, date | US20060809539P | 30.05.2006 Original published format: US 809539 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007140394 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020953 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61C8/0075 (EP,US);
A61C8/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/49] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR EINZELZAHNERSATZ BEI EINER PERSON IM WACHSTUM | [2009/07] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SINGLE TOOTH REPLACEMENT IN A GROWING INDIVIDUAL | [2009/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR REMPLACER UNE SEULE DENT CHEZ UN INDIVIDU EN COURS DE CROISSANCE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 23.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2011 | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6655962 (KENNARD DON [US]) [X] 1-3,5,11,12,14 * column 8, lines 11-13; figures 1-2G * [I] 9,10; | [XI]US3672058 (NIKOGHOSSIAN ALBERT-JEAN) [X] 1-3,5,8,11,12,14 * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 26 * * figures 1-2 * [I] 6,7,13; | [XI]US2004127909 (MORGAN VINCENT J [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0010] - [0021]; figure 1 * [I] 6,7,13; | [X]ES2204261 (IMPLANT MICRODENT SYSTEM S L [ES]) [X] 1-3,8,11-14 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US6572373 (TRAMONTE SILVANO UMBERTO [IT]); | [Y]KR100534243B |