EP2030349 - DATA MESSAGE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turk, Marc Timothy 58 Botha Road Botha's Hill KwaZulu-Natal / ZA | [2016/44] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Turk, Marc Timothy 58 Botha Road Botha's Hill KwaZulu-Natal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | Windsor, Louise, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762378.3 | 06.03.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007ZA00017 | Priority number, date | ZA20060001193 | 06.03.2006 Original published format: ZA 200601193 | ZA20060009203 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: ZA 200609203 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008017084 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030349 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030349 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
H04L51/18 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (GB);
H04L51/212 (EP,GB,US);
H04W4/12 (GB)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | G06F15/16 | ||
Former IPC [2009/10] | H04J1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DATENNACHRICHTEN-VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/10] | English: | DATA MESSAGE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2009/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE MESSAGES DE DONNÉES | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2007 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | GB | 06.03.2017 | LU | 06.03.2017 | MT | 06.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.03.2007 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.03.2007 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6327611 (EVERINGHAM JAMES [US]) [A] 1,2,8-12,14 * abstract * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 18 * * figures 2,12,13 *; | [A]US6360221 (GOUGH MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,14 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US2005144246 (MALIK DALE W [US]) [X] 1,2,8,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 5,6a * [A] 9-12; | [IA]EP1557988 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [I] 1,2,9,12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * table 1 * * figure 2 * [A] 8,10,11 | International search | [A]US2002010792 (BORDER JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2002026487 (OGILVIE JOHN W L [US], et al); | [Y]US2002120692 (SCHIAVONE VINCENT J [US], et al); | [X]US2005004992 (HORSTMANN JENS U [US], et al); | [A]US2005021836 (REED CARL J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005201533 (EMAM SEAN A [US], et al); | [A]US2006002334 (WASHBURN E R III [US]) | by applicant | US2005144246 | EP1557988 |