EP1991854 - MULTIPLE CHANNEL RVDT WITH DUAL LOAD PATH AND FAIL-SAFE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAVLICO CORPORATION 14501 Princeton Ave. Moorpark CA 93021 / US | [2014/48] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states KAVLICO CORPORATION 14501 Princeton Ave. Moorpark CA 93021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAZDANI, Saeed 3900 Hunters Grove Court Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/38] | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2008/47] | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762410.4 | 24.01.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US60975 | Priority number, date | US20060339040 | 25.01.2006 Original published format: US 339040 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087564 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991854 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991854 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/14, G01D5/20 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G01D11/245 (EP,US);
G01D5/20 (EP,US);
G01D5/2291 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | G01N11/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKANAL-RVDT MIT DOPPELTEM LADUNGSPFAD UND AUSFALLSICHERHEITSMECHANISMUS | [2008/47] | English: | MULTIPLE CHANNEL RVDT WITH DUAL LOAD PATH AND FAIL-SAFE MECHANISM | [2008/47] | French: | TRANSFORMATEUR DIFFÉRENTIEL VARIABLE TOURNANT (RVDT) MULTICANAUX AVEC DOUBLE CHEMIN DE CHARGE ET MÉCANISME DE SÉCURITÉ INTÉGRÉE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2007 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | IE | 24.01.2015 | LU | 24.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.01.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.01.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5779587 (REILLY WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 2,3,5,6 * figure 11 * * column 10, lines 29-35 *; | [XYI]DE19855960 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-2b * * claim - * [Y] 2,3,5,6 [I] 7-10; | [A]US6641085 (DELEA JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 10 - line 30 *; | [XI]WO2004048899 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * figure - * * abstract * * claim - * [I] 10; | [A]US2005103928 (FLATT JAMES E [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure - ** abstract * | International search | [Y]US4345320 (BERNEY JEAN-CLAUDE); | [A]US4910488 (DAVIS CLARK C [US], et al); | [Y]US5541486 (ZOLLER ALLAN C [US], et al); | [A]US5701114 (CHASS JACOB [US]); | [Y]US5779587 (REILLY WILLIAM [US]); | [Y]US6641085 (DELEA JAMES F [US], et al); | [Y]US2005103928 (FLATT JAMES E [US]) |