EP1978802 - POLYMERIZED HEMOGLOBIN MEDIA AND ITS USE IN ISOLATION AND TRANSPLANTATION OF ISLET CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHFIELD LABORATORIES, INC. Suite 1000, 1560 Sherman Evanston, IL 60201-4422 / US | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUBLEDAY, Marc 326 Alicia Drive Cary, IL 60013 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762535.8 | 24.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007US60989 | Priority number, date | US20060761663P | 24.01.2006 Original published format: US 761663 P | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087570 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1978802 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, A61K38/48, A61K38/42 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
C12N5/0676 (US);
A01N1/0226 (US);
A61K35/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/42 (EP,US);
A61K38/482 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/39, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/42, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/482, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/4886, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | 25.07.2008 | BA | 25.07.2008 | HR | 25.07.2008 | MK | 25.07.2008 | RS | 25.07.2008 | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERTES HÄMOGLOBINMEDIUM UND VERWENDUNG DAVON BEI DER ISOLIERUNG UND TRANSPLANTATION VON INSELZELLEN | [2008/42] | English: | POLYMERIZED HEMOGLOBIN MEDIA AND ITS USE IN ISOLATION AND TRANSPLANTATION OF ISLET CELLS | [2008/42] | French: | MILIEU D HEMOGLOBINE POLYMERISEE ET SON UTILISATION POUR L I̋SOLATION ET LA TRANSPLANTATION D I̋LOTS DE LANGERHANS | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 14.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02089571 (BREONICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * paragraph [0041]; claim - *; | [DY]US6498141 (DEWOSKIN RICHARD E [US], et al) [DY] 1-34 * claim - *; | [DY]US6506599 (YOON TAI-WOOK [KR]) [DY] 1-34 * claim - *; | [Y] - STANDL T, "Artificial oxygen carriers: Hemoglobin-based oxygen carriers - Current status 2004", TRANSFUSION MEDICINE AND HEMOTHERAPY, (2004), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 1660-3796, pages 262 - 268, XP009087719 [Y] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000080412 | [Y] - TOUSSAINT MARIE ET AL, "Effects of three Hb-based oxygen-carrying solutions on neutrophil activation in vitro: Quantitative measurement of the expression of adherence receptors", TRANSFUSION (BETHESDA), (200102), vol. 41, no. 2, ISSN 0041-1132, pages 226 - 231, XP002445628 [Y] 1-34 * page 227, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 228, column 1, paragraph 7 * | [PX] - AVILA J G ET AL, "Improved outcomes in islet isolation and transplantation by the use of a novel hemoglobin-based O2 carrier", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TRANSPLANTATION 2006 UNITED KINGDOM, (2006), vol. 6, no. 12, ISSN 1600-6135 1600-6143, pages 2861 - 2870, XP002445629 [PX] 1-34 * the whole document * | [X] - WONG HIN-CHUNG ET AL, "Identification and characterization of a protease produced by Vibrio parahaemolyticus in iron-limited medium", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1994), Database accession no. PREV199698749567, XP002445634 [X] 1,2,4,5,7-13,17,18,21,23-25,27-29 * abstract * | [ ] - CHINESE JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY (TAIPEI), (1994), vol. 27, no. 4, ISSN 0253-2662, pages 173 - 185 |