EP1979020 - PERITONEAL DIALYSIS METHODS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states U.S. Government: Department of Veterans Affairs Office of the General Counsel Washington, D.C: 20420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states The Regents Of The University Of California Office Of Technology Transfer 1111 Franklin Street 5th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states U.S. Government: Department of Veterans Affairs Office of the General Counsel Washington, D.C: 20420 / US | |||
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states U.S. Department Of Veterans Affairs Office Of General Counsel - PSG IV 810 Vermont Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20420 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents Of The University Of California Office Of Technology Transfer 1111 Franklin Street 5th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | |||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states U.S. Department Of Veterans Affairs Office Of General Counsel - PSG IV 810 Vermont Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Martin 16022 Parthenia Street North Hills, CA 91343 / US | 02 /
LEE, David B.N. 16016 Jeanne Lane Encino, CA 91436 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07762948.3 | 30.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007US02664 | Priority number, date | US20060763254P | 30.01.2006 Original published format: US 763254 P | US20060763337P | 30.01.2006 Original published format: US 763337 P | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007089855 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1979020 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M1/28, A61M1/16 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A61M1/1696 (EP,US);
A61M1/1686 (EP,US);
A61M1/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Title | German: | PERITONEALE DIALYSEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2008/42] | English: | PERITONEAL DIALYSIS METHODS AND APPARATUS | [2008/42] | French: | MÉTHODES ET APPAREIL DE DIALYSE PÉRITONÉALE | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 21.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | 27.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5445610 (EVERT CARL F [US]) [Y] 11 * abstract *; | [XYI]US5944684 (ROBERTS MARTIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,15,16,18,22,23 * figure 2 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 37 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 65 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 40 * [Y] 6,9,11,13,14 [I] 19-21; | [Y]US2003113931 (PAN LI [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * paragraphs [0099] - [0105]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US2003113932 (STERNBERG SHMUEL [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0014] , [0054] *; | [A]WO03051422 (NAT QUALITY CARE INC [US], et al) [A] 12* page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 11 *; | [Y]US2004082903 (MICHELI BRIAN R [US]) [Y] 9,13,14 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0020] , [0021] , [0023] , [0042] , [0055] , [0069] , [0077] - [0081] - [0087] *; | [YA]WO2005062973 (CHEMICA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] , [0081] , [0088] * [A] 14 | International search | [Y]US4338190 (KRAUS MENAHEM A, et al); | [Y]US4581141 (ASH STEPHEN R [US]); | [Y]US4586920 (PEABODY ALAN M [US]); | [Y]US4618343 (POLASCHEGG HANS-DIETRICH [DE]); | [Y]US4765907 (SCOTT ROBERT D [US]); | [Y]US4790319 (SLOVAK PETR [CS]); | [Y]US5846533 (PRUSINER STANLEY B [US], et al); | [Y]US2001012921 (ZICHERMAN YEHUDA [IL]); | [Y]US2002112609 (WONG RAYMOND J [US]); | [X]US6585682 (HARALDSSON BOERJE [SE], et al); | [Y]WO2005025726 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US2005085542 (ARDUINI ARDUINO [IT]); | [Y]US2005209563 (HOPPING PETER [US], et al) |