EP1984956 - THERMAL DIODIC DEVICES FOR HIGH COOLING RATE APPLICATIONS AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solid State Cooling, Inc. 20 Pleasant View Road Pleasant Valley NY 12569 / US | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLITSCH, Frederick, A. 25 Twin Ponds Road New Windsor, NY 12553 / US | 02 /
WRIGHT, Lloyd 16 Farview Rd Hopewell Junction, NY 12533-6819 / US | 03 /
YOUNG, Lloyd 5 Simone Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 / US | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07763042.4 | 31.01.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007US02708 | Priority number, date | US20060763731P | 31.01.2006 Original published format: US 763731 P | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007089874 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984956 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L37/02 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
H10N10/00 (EP,US);
H10N15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCHE DIODISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR ANWENDUNGEN MIT HOHER ABKÜHLGESCHWINDIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/44] | English: | THERMAL DIODIC DEVICES FOR HIGH COOLING RATE APPLICATIONS AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2008/44] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE DIODE THERMIQUE POUR APPLICATIONS A VITESSE DE REFROIDISSEMENT ELEVEE ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2009 | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3566214 (USUDA KOJI); | [Y]US5790298 (TONAR WILLIAM L [US]); | [Y]US5841021 (DE CASTRO EMORY S [US], et al); | [Y]US5989721 (LOVELL WALTER CARL [US]); | [Y]US2005217568 (RUPICH MARTIN W [US], et al) |