EP1981837 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING SPHINGOSINE-1-PHOSPHATE (S1P) RECEPTOR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praecis Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Hongfeng 11 Brucewood Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 02 /
EVINDAR, Ghotas 31 Middlesex Circle, Apt. 19 Waltham, MA 02452 / US | 03 /
KAVARANA, Malcolm, J. 516 Farms Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Barry 237 Prospect Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 05 /
SAHA, Ashis, K. 6 Cardinal Court Stow, MA 01775 / US | 06 /
SATZ, Alexander, L. 180 Hillside Avenue, 2 Needham, MA 02494 / US | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Johanna Elise, et al GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Griffith, Johanna Elise, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07763628.0 | 30.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US02353 | Priority number, date | US20060349069 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: US 349069 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007092190 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981837 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C235/00, C07D231/12, C07D233/54, C07D239/26, C07D249/06, C07D261/08, C07D263/32, C07D271/10, C07D277/28, C07D285/12, C07D307/42, C07D317/58, C07D317/64, C07D471/04, C07F9/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C237/04 (EP,US);
C07C237/42 (EP,US);
C07C255/60 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C317/40 (EP,US);
C07C323/41 (EP,US);
C07D207/12 (EP,US);
C07D209/88 (EP,US);
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/54 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D249/06 (EP,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D271/10 (EP,US);
C07D277/28 (EP,US);
C07D285/12 (EP,US);
C07D307/42 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/64 (EP,US);
C07D333/16 (EP,US);
C07D417/10 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07F9/65031 (EP,US);
C07F9/6506 (EP,US);
C07F9/6512 (EP,US);
C07F9/6518 (EP,US);
C07F9/653 (EP,US);
C07F9/65312 (EP,US);
C07F9/6539 (EP,US);
C07F9/65395 (EP,US);
C07F9/65517 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 11.08.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MODULATION VON SPHINGOSIN-1-PHOSPHAT-REZEPTORAKTIVITÄT | [2008/43] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING SPHINGOSINE-1-PHOSPHATE (S1P) RECEPTOR ACTIVITY | [2008/43] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE MODULER L'ACTIVITE DU RECEPTEUR DU SPHINGOSINE-1-PHOSPHATE (S1P) | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004010949 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [A] 1-62* claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004103279 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1602660 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-62 * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO2006020951 (PRAECIS PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-62 * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO2006063033 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [PX] 1-62 * claim 1 *; | [E]WO2007024922 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-62 * claim 1 * |