EP2047038 - IMPROVED BOOM ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Challenge Implements Holdings Pty Limited Leewood Drive Orange NSW 2800 / AU | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Daniel 1297 Forest Reefs Road Forest Reefs, NSW 2798 / AU | 02 /
SMITH, Tim "Redmonds" 150 Carbine Road Forest Reefs, NSW 2798 / AU | 03 /
O'SHAUGHNESSY, Collin Lot 2 Amaroo Road Borenore, NSW 2800 / AU | 04 /
HEALEY, Craig Bradgate Park, 138b Malabar Road Orange, NSW 2800 / AU | 05 /
HEALEY, John Bradgate Park, 138 Malabar Road Orange, NSW 2800 / AU | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Lenne, Laurence Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Lenne, Laurence Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41 Rue Aristide Briand 92160 Antony / FR | ||
Former [2009/16] | Lenne, Laurence Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07763782.5 | 17.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007AU00990 | Priority number, date | AU20060903984 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: AU 2006903984 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008011661 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047038 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/38, B66C23/64 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
E02F3/34 (EP,US);
E02F3/422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE AUSLEGERANORDNUNG | [2009/16] | English: | IMPROVED BOOM ARRANGEMENT | [2009/16] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE FLÈCHE AMÉLIORÉ | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 07.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4686782 (NAGATOMO MASATSUGU [JP]); | [X]US3057494 (HOLOPAINEN VAINO J, et al); | [X]JPH08144323 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO); | [X]US3952890 (ARMSTRONG ANTHONY CLUBLEY); | [X]US4355946 (WYKHUIS LLOYD A, et al); | [X]US4431364 (REDENBARGER PHILIP D [US], et al); | [X]JPH08302747 (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND) |