EP2169175 - AN EXTENSION LADDER AND ITS USE IN A STRAIGHT COMBINATION LADDER, A PLATFORM LADDER OR A STEPLADDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Kecheng Xiaodian Industrial Area Beichen District Tianjin 300402 / CN | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta Kancelaria Patentowa Matthias Scholl, Inc. Skrytka Pocztowa 13 75-454 Koszalin / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Hryszkiewicz, Danuta Kancelaria Patentowa Matthias Scholl, Inc. Ul. Jana z Kolna 38 75-204 Koszalin / PL | Application number, filing date | 07764155.3 | 03.07.2007 | [2010/13] | WO2007CN70226 | Priority number, date | CN2007157415 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: CN200710057415 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141513 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169175 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06C1/12, E06C1/39, E06C7/08, E06C7/46 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
E06C1/32 (EP,US);
E06C1/125 (EP,US);
E06C1/39 (EP,US);
E06C7/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | AUSZIEHLEITER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN EINER GERADEN KOMBILEITER, PLATTFORMLEITER ODER TRITTLEITER | [2010/13] | English: | AN EXTENSION LADDER AND ITS USE IN A STRAIGHT COMBINATION LADDER, A PLATFORM LADDER OR A STEPLADDER | [2010/13] | French: | ÉCHELLE À PERCHES ET SON UTILISATION EN ÉCHELLE SIMPLE TRANSFORMABLE, EN ÉCHELLE À PLATEFORME, OU EN ESCABEAU | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2009 | Translation filed | 17.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2305956 (KUO GARY [TW]); | [Y]US4574918 (MARQUES SALVADOR A [ES]); | [Y]CN2430531Y (HONGKONG LIDE TECHNOLOGY CO LT [HK]); | [Y]CN2851496Y (PICA CORP [JP]) |