EP2047135 - FRICTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERBING, Tim-Florian Im Höfergarten 1 57518 Betzdorf / DE | 02 /
SPANDERN, Christian Höhenweg 26d 57578 Elkenroth / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/16] | Application number, filing date | 07764405.2 | 28.06.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007DE01150 | Priority number, date | DE20061033739 | 21.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006033739 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009261 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047135 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047135 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02, C04B35/83 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
F16D69/023 (EP,US);
F16D69/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | REIBSYSTEM | [2009/16] | English: | FRICTION SYSTEM | [2009/16] | French: | SYSTÈM DE FROTTEMENT | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2007 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | IT | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | AT | 28.06.2012 | IE | 28.06.2012 | LU | 28.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | GB | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
AT | 28.06.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
LU | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
AT | 28.06.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
AT | 28.06.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GB | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 28.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4259397 (SAITO KAZUHISA, et al) [Y] 5-7* column 1, line 44 - line 55 *; | [XY]EP0554902 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 21 - line 48 * * page 3, line 35 - line 51 * [Y] 5-7; | [XY]EP1457703 (SGL CARBON AG [DE]) [X] 1,11-13,17-19,21 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] * [Y] 22; | [X]EP1459861 (SGL CARBON AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-15,17-22 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [XY]EP1489331 (SGL CARBON AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,11-13,17,18 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * [Y] 22 | by applicant | DE4438456 | EP1277715 | DE10156947 |