EP2049581 - POLYETHERAMINE MACROMONOMERS COMPRISING TWO NEIGHBORING HYDROXYL GROUPS AND THEIR USE FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PÖLLMANN, Klaus Oberbrunnerstrasse 21 81475 München / DE | 02 /
MÜNTER, Jürgen Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 54 70736 Fellbach / DE | [2009/23] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
PÖLLMANN, Klaus Hoechster Str. 17 84489 Burghausen / DE | ||
02 /
MÜNTER, Jürgen Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 54 70736 Fellbach / DE | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 07764637.0 | 13.06.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007EP05207 | Priority number, date | DE20061036220 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036220 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008014844 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049581 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049581 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/12, C08G18/48, C08G18/50, C08G18/66 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (US);
C07C271/16 (US);
C08G18/325 (US);
C08G18/348 (EP,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LV, NL, PT, SE [2011/11] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYETHERAMIN-MAKROMONOMERE MIT ZWEI BENACHBARTEN HYDROXYLGRUPPEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHANEN | [2009/17] | English: | POLYETHERAMINE MACROMONOMERS COMPRISING TWO NEIGHBORING HYDROXYL GROUPS AND THEIR USE FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANES | [2009/17] | French: | MACROMONOMÈRES DE POLYÉTHERAMINE AYANT DEUX GROUPES HYDROXYLE VOISINS ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA FABRICATION DE POLYURÉTHANNES | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LV | 20.04.2011 | [2011/52] | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2006084592 (CLARIANT PRODUKTE DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1-11 *; | [X] - SCHULTZ R A ET AL, "12-, 15-, and 18-Membered-Ring Nitrogen-Pivot Lariat Ethers: Syntheses, Properties, and Sodium and Ammonium Cation Binding Properties", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1985), vol. 107, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6659 - 6668, XP002377502 [X] 1-6 * page 6660, column RECHTS * * page 6666, column RECHTS * * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00309a039 |