EP2038446 - Method of manufacturing AA7000-series aluminium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/13] | AA7000-SERIES ALUMINIUM ALLOY PRODUCTS AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | ||
[2016/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Aleris Aluminum Koblenz GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOSLA, Sunil De Raep 37 1941 GT Beverwijk / NL | 02 /
NORMAN, Andrew Dennenstraat 44 1943 LS Beverwijk / NL | 03 /
VAN SCHOONEVELT, Hugo Middenweg 13 1463 HB Noordbeemster / NL | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/13] | Müller, Frank Peter, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07765092.7 | 05.07.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007EP05973 | Priority number, date | US20060818965P | 07.07.2006 Original published format: US 818965 P | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008003504 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2038446 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2038446 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/053, C22C21/10 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
C22F1/057 (EP,US);
C22C21/14 (EP,US);
C22C21/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Al-Legierungen der AA7000-Serie | [2016/37] | English: | Method of manufacturing AA7000-series aluminium alloys | [2016/37] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des alliages d'aluminium de la serie AA7000 | [2016/37] |
Former [2009/13] | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSPRODUKTE DER REIHE AA7000 UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2009/13] | AA7000-SERIES ALUMINIUM ALLOY PRODUCTS AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | ||
Former [2009/13] | PRODUITS EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM SÉRIE AA7000, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2007 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | IE | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LU | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MT | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.07.2007 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.07.2007 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.07.2007 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB952288 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA) [X] 1-19,21,23-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1508123 (PECHINEY PROD CHIMIQUES SA) [X] 1-9,11-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2066696 (ALUSUISSE) [X] 1-20,23-30 * the whole document *; | [X]US3674448 (BROWN ROBERT H, et al) [X] 1-19,21,23-30* the whole document *; | [X]FR2234375 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9203586 (COMALCO ALU [AU]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2846669 (PECHINEY RHENALU [FR]) [X] 1-20,22-30 * the whole document *; | [X] - HUFNAGEL W, Key to Aluminium Alloys, 4th Edition, ALUMINIUM-SCHLUESSEL = KEY TO ALUMINIUM ALLOYS, PAGE(S) 195-205, (1991), XP002194851 [X] 27-30 * page 202 - page 204 * | by applicant | US4589932 | WO9203586 | US5213639 | US5221377 | US5312498 | US5560789 | US5593516 | US5865914 | US5865911 | US5888320 | EP1026270 | EP1114877 | EP1143027 | US2002039664 | FR2846669 |