EP2032354 - VACUUM INSULATION PANELS FOR AIRCRAFT INTERIORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag, 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Rainer Emsener Strasse 16a 21224 Rosengarten / DE | 02 /
MÜHLTHALER, Georg Georg-Bonne-Strasse 13 22609 Hamburg / DE | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Peckmann, Ralf Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07765556.1 | 22.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007EP56239 | Priority number, date | DE20061028956 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006028956 | US20060815949P | 23.06.2006 Original published format: US 815949 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007147885 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032354 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/12, B64C1/12, B64C1/40, F16L59/065 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B64C1/40 (EP,US);
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
B64C1/066 (EP,US);
F16L59/065 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y10T428/231 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | VAKUUM-ISOLATIONSTAFELN FÜR DAS INNERE VON FLUGZEUGEN | [2009/11] | English: | VACUUM INSULATION PANELS FOR AIRCRAFT INTERIORS | [2009/11] | French: | PANNEAUX D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE POUR LES INTÉRIEURS D'AÉRONEF | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14] | 10.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14] | Appeal following examination | 04.12.2018 | Appeal received No. T0457/19 | 07.02.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1258344 (JAMCO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0065]; claim - * * paragraph [0063] * [Y] 1-15; | [XP]WO2006083314 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,7,9,12-15 * example 6; claims 14-17 * * page 7, lines 5-19; example - *; | [A]WO02103127 (BIANCHI GIANFRANCO [IT]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 23,24; figure -; claim - * * page 2, line 8 - page 15, line 5 *; | [A]EP1258343 (JAMCO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0092]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2006150647 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1157824 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | DE19906774 | DE10027925 | US6179086 |