EP2044682 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR MEASURING THE CURRENT CONSUMPTION OF A PULSE-WIDTH MODULATION-CONTROLLED DIRECT-CURRENT MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Stefan Bernhardshoefstr.60c 77876 Kappelrodeck / DE | 02 /
KAHLES, Patric Kastanienbuehnweg 10 77815 Buehl / DE | [2009/15] | Application number, filing date | 07765756.7 | 02.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP56638 | Priority number, date | DE20061032737 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006032737 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008006727 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2044682 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044682 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/24 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H02P7/29 (EP);
H02H7/0833 (EP);
H02P29/032 (EP);
H02M1/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/32] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER STROMAUFNAHME EINES DURCH PULSWEITENMODULATION GESTEUERTEN GLEICHSTROMMOTORS | [2009/15] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR MEASURING THE CURRENT CONSUMPTION OF A PULSE-WIDTH MODULATION-CONTROLLED DIRECT-CURRENT MOTOR | [2009/15] | French: | CIRCUITERIE DE MESURE DE LA CONSOMMATION DE COURANT D'UN MOTEUR À COURANT CONTINU COMMANDÉ PAR MODULATION D'IMPULSIONS EN DURÉE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 17.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4329919 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, lines 30-60; figures 1-3 * * page 5, lines 30-65 *; | [Y]JP2000080858 (AISIN SEIKI) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2004086601 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figures 2,4 *; | [Y]JPH04172984 (MITSUBA ELECTRIC MFG CO) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * |